EP4001230 - METHOD FOR DIVIDING COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitto Denko Corporation 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANNO, Toshihiro c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
SHINOZAKI, Takahiro c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 03 /
NAKAI, Kota cc/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 04 /
MATSUO, Naoyuki c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 20841249.4 | 19.02.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020JP06412 | Priority number, date | JP20190131509 | 16.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019131509 | [2022/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021009961 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4001230 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C03B33/033, C03B33/07, C03B33/09, B28D5/00, B23K26/364, G02B5/30, G02F1/1335 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
B28D5/00 (EP);
C03B33/074 (EP,KR,US);
C03B33/078 (US);
B23K26/0006 (EP);
B23K26/0624 (EP,US);
B23K26/359 (US);
B23K26/364 (EP,KR);
B23K26/402 (EP,US);
B23K26/53 (EP);
B26F3/06 (KR);
B28D5/0011 (EP);
C03B33/0222 (EP,US);
C03B33/033 (EP,KR);
C03B33/091 (KR);
G02B5/3033 (EP);
G02F1/1303 (EP);
G02F1/13363 (EP);
B23K2101/36 (EP);
B23K2103/172 (EP);
B23K2103/18 (EP);
B23K2103/42 (EP,US);
B23K2103/54 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TEILUNG EINES VERBUNDSTOFFES | [2022/21] | English: | METHOD FOR DIVIDING COMPOSITE MATERIAL | [2022/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DIVISION DE MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2022 | Translation filed | 18.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 01.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/04] | 21.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2011178636 (MITSUBOSHI DIAMOND IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2012240881 (MITSUBOSHI DIAMOND IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2014105147 (MITSUBOSHI DIAMOND IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2017145188 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [A]JP2018519229 ; | [A]JP2018170474 (MITSUBOSHI DIAMOND IND CO LTD) | by applicant | JPS6239461B | JP2011178636 | JP2012073580 | WO2013175767 |