EP3974237 - MOTOR CONTROL METHOD, APPARATUS AND DEVICE, AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Great Wall Motor Company Limited No. 2266 Chaoyang South St. Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/13] | For all designated states Great Wall Motor Company Limited No.2266 Chaoyang South St. Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yinlei No. 2266 Chaoyang South Street Baoding City, Hebei 071000 / CN | 02 /
LING, Wenchao No. 2266 Chaoyang South Street Baoding City, Hebei 071000 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Shujiang No. 2266 Chaoyang South Street Baoding City, Hebei 071000 / CN | 04 /
SUN, Jiaxin No. 2266 Chaoyang South Street Baoding City, Hebei 071000 / CN | 05 /
LIU, Xiu No. 2266 Chaoyang South Street Baoding City, Hebei 071000 / CN | 06 /
HOU, Wentao No. 2266 Chaoyang South Street Baoding City, Hebei 071000 / CN | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 20841453.2 | 14.07.2020 | [2022/13] | WO2020CN101915 | Priority number, date | CN201910641279 | 16.07.2019 Original published format: CN201910641279 | [2022/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021008527 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3974237 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60L15/20 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
B60L15/2081 (EP,CN);
B60L15/20 (CN);
B60L2240/421 (EP,CN);
B60L2240/423 (EP,CN);
B60L2260/44 (EP);
Y02T10/64 (EP);
Y02T10/72 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Title | German: | MOTORSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN, -GERÄT UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/13] | English: | MOTOR CONTROL METHOD, APPARATUS AND DEVICE, AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2022/13] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2021 | Translation filed | 23.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 13.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.09.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1955916 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11* paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0232]; figures 1-17 *; | [A]GB2506600 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 8, line 10 - page 15, line 20; figures 1-5 *; | [XI]CN109591621 (BEIJING ELECTRIC VEHICLE CO LTD) [X] 1,8-11 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0087]; figures 1-4 * [I] 2-7 |