EP4081567 - FLEXIBLE FOAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENG, Yan Room 102, No. 14 Lane 165, Do Zhu An Bang Road Changning District Shanghai 200050 / CN | 02 /
WU, Weicheng No. 33 Qin Qiao Road Pudong District Shanghai 201206 / CN | 03 /
TANG, Min No. 33 Qin Qiao Road Pudong District Shanghai 201206 / CN | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude K12 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 20842210.5 | 17.12.2020 | [2022/44] | WO2020EP86797 | Priority number, date | CN201911352406 | 24.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911352406 | EP20200160305 | 02.03.2020 Original published format: EP 20160305 | [2022/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021130104 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4081567 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/32, C08G18/48, C08G18/66, C08G18/72, C08G18/75, C08G18/79 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
C08G18/3275 (EP,US);
C08G18/4816 (EP,US);
C08G18/14 (US);
C08G18/3281 (EP,US);
C08G18/4841 (EP,US);
C08G18/6688 (EP);
C08G18/725 (EP);
C08G18/755 (EP);
C08G18/792 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | FLEXIBLER SCHAUMSTOFF | [2022/44] | English: | FLEXIBLE FOAM | [2022/44] | French: | MOUSSE SOUPLE | [2023/32] |
Former [2022/44] | MOUSSE FLEXIBLE | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 25.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/22] | 25.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2019352445 (ZHAO DONG BO [CN], et al) [A] 1-25* table 2 * | by applicant | US5147897 | JP2001072738 | JP2003012756 | US2006160977 | JP2006257187 | EP1721720 | CN101157747 | CN101412798 | CN101580575 | CN102558594 | CN104767000 |