EP4078840 - TECHNIQUES FOR USING SENSOR INFORMATION FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Tao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
PEZESHKI, Hamed 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
YOO, Taesang 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20842392.1 | 16.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020US65255 | Priority number, date | US201962948790P | 16.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962948790 P | US202017122904 | 15.12.2020 Original published format: US202017122904 | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021126937 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4078840 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04B7/08, H04W16/28, H04W72/04, G01S17/00, H04W64/00, H04W4/02 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
H04B7/0695 (EP,KR,US);
H04B17/17 (EP,KR);
H04B17/3913 (EP);
H04B7/0404 (KR);
H04B7/088 (EP,KR);
H04W24/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/322 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/143 (KR,US);
H04W52/42 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | TECHNIKEN ZUM VERWENDEN VON SENSORINFORMATIONEN FÜR DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATIONEN | [2022/43] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR USING SENSOR INFORMATION FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS | [2022/43] | French: | TECHNIQUES D'UTILISATION D'INFORMATIONS DE CAPTEUR POUR COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 27.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2475123 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]); | [A]US2016014566 (BENGTSSON ERIK [SE], et al); | [XYI]WO2017109456 (SOFANT TECH LTD [GB]); | [XYI]US2018191422 (XIA PENGFEI [US], et al); | [XYI]US2018234137 (QU QI [US], et al); | [Y]US2018376275 (JIANG YI [US], et al); | [XYI]US2019261193 (TORSNER JOHAN [FI], et al); | [XYI]US2019260455 (RYU JUNG HO [US], et al); | [Y]WO2019192711 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al); | [A]CN110572854 (CHINA TELECOM CO LTD ); |