EP4042292 - AUTOMATICALLY ENHANCING STREAMING MEDIA USING CONTENT TRANSFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIRBHATE, Akhilesh Mountain View California 94043 / US | 02 /
DAS, Ariyam Mountain View California 94043 / US | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Beal, James Michael, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20842427.5 | 17.12.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020US65559 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022132151 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4042292 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/432 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
G06F16/433 (EP,US);
G06F16/483 (US);
G06F16/538 (EP);
G10L15/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE VERSTÄRKUNG VON STREAMING-MEDIEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON INHALTSTRANSFORMATIONEN | [2022/33] | English: | AUTOMATICALLY ENHANCING STREAMING MEDIA USING CONTENT TRANSFORMATION | [2022/33] | French: | AMÉLIORATION AUTOMATIQUE DE DIFFUSION MULTIMÉDIA EN CONTINU À L'AIDE D'UNE TRANSFORMATION DE CONTENU | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 08.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.03.2024 | 21.03.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/32] | 03.04.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2020321005 (IYER VISWANATHAN [US], et al); |