EP3965303 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujikura, Ltd. 1-5-1, Kiba, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASEGAWA, Yuta Chiba 2858550 / JP | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 20842544.7 | 14.12.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020JP46499 | Priority number, date | JP20200122027 | 16.07.2020 Original published format: JP 2020122027 | [2022/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022014066 | Date: | 20.01.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3965303 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/036, H04B1/38 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
H01Q1/2283 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (CN);
H01Q1/02 (EP,US);
H04B1/036 (EP,US);
H04B1/0475 (EP,US);
H05K7/20 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/10] | H04B1/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSMODUL | [2022/10] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION MODULE | [2022/10] | French: | MODULE DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2021 | Translation filed | 28.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 22.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017273173 (IKUTA TOMOHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0038] - [0042]; figures 1A-1C *; | [A]US2019191546 (FUJII TOMOHARU [JP]) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0039] - [0051]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2020185342 (DALMIA SIDHARTH [US], et al) [A] 1-4* paragraphs [0029] - [0044]; figures 1A-1C * | International search | [A]JP2013229861 (ROHM CO LTD) [A] 1-4; | [A]WO2020022180 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [A] 1-4; | [A]JP2005026368 (TDK CORP) [A] 1-4 | by applicant | JP2020122027 |