EP4069585 - MULTIPLE HOIST DELIVERY SYSTEM FOR DELIVERING PARCELS USING UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Parcel Service Of America, Inc. 55 Glenlake Parkway N.E. Atlanta, GA 30328 / US | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PASS, John c/o United Parcel Service of America, Inc. 55 Glenlake Parkway, NE Atlanta, GA 30328 / US | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 20842603.1 | 02.12.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020US62849 | Priority number, date | US201962942493P | 02.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962942493 P | US202017108613 | 01.12.2020 Original published format: US202017108613 | [2022/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021113331 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4069585 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4069585 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B64C39/02, B64D1/22 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
B64D1/22 (EP,US);
B64D1/12 (US);
B64U10/14 (EP,US);
B64U10/16 (EP,US);
B64U10/25 (EP,US);
B64U2101/64 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PAKETAUSLIEFERUNGSSYSTEM MITTELS EINER DROHNE UNTER VERWENDUNG VON MEHREREN SEILWINDEN | [2024/10] | English: | MULTIPLE HOIST DELIVERY SYSTEM FOR DELIVERING PARCELS USING UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLES | [2022/41] | French: | SYSTÈME DE LIVRAISON DE COLIS PAR DRONE ÉQUIPÉ DE PLUSIEURS TREUILS | [2024/10] |
Former [2022/41] | LIEFERSYSTEM MIT MEHREREN WINDEN ZUR LIEFERUNG VON PAKETEN MITTELS UNBEMANNTER LUFTFAHRZEUGE | ||
Former [2022/41] | SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION À TREUILS MULTIPLES PERMETTANT DE DISTRIBUER DES PAQUETS À L'AIDE DE VÉHICULES AÉRIENS SANS PILOTE | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 23.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2205470 (UNITED AIRCRAFT CORP [US]); | [A]EP2481671 (EUROCOPTER FRANCE [FR]); | [XAY]US2017253335 (THOMPSON JOHN P [US], et al); | [Y]CN107985598 (HUANG DEYI); | [Y]WO2018223031 (FLIRTEY HOLDINGS INC [US]) |