EP4096732 - FLUID MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, Minnesota 55311 / US | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FANNING, Leah 3 Glencarra Drive Crann Ard Clonmel, E91 X9W0 / IE | 02 /
BYRNE, Paul Castlecreen County Kilkenny Kilkenny, R95 YP6C / IE | 03 /
RAUNIYAR, Niraj Prasad 15644 60th Ave N Plymouth, Minnesota 55446 / US | 04 /
GYLLENHAAL, Evan 42 Lakewood Drive Sudbury, Massachusetts 01776 / US | 05 /
SHAH, Vivek 39 Jacob Way Reading, Massachusetts 01867 / US | 06 /
KHATTAR, Nishant 4135 Parkridge Dr. White Bear TWP, Minnesota 55110 / US | 07 /
SMITH, Noel Garryricken Windgap Co. Kilkenny, R95 HX88 / IE | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 20842754.2 | 17.12.2020 | [2022/49] | WO2020US65568 | Priority number, date | US202062967806P | 30.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062967806 P | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021154416 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4096732 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00, A61M3/02, A61B1/015 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
A61M3/0216 (EP,KR);
A61M5/1723 (US);
A61B1/00066 (EP,KR);
A61B1/015 (EP,KR);
A61M1/72 (EP);
A61M1/774 (EP,KR);
A61M3/0201 (EP);
A61M3/0202 (EP,KR);
A61M3/022 (EP,KR);
A61M3/0258 (EP,KR);
A61M5/142 (US);
A61M2205/127 (EP,KR);
A61M2205/18 (KR);
A61M2205/3306 (EP,KR);
A61M2205/3331 (KR,US);
A61M2205/3334 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/3344 (EP,KR);
A61M2205/3368 (EP,KR);
A61M2205/3393 (EP,KR);
A61M2205/36 (EP);
A61M2205/3653 (KR);
A61M2205/502 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/505 (EP,KR);
A61M2205/581 (KR);
A61M2205/583 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | FLUIDVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM | [2022/49] | English: | FLUID MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2022/49] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE FLUIDE | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 19.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]EP0329599 (WIEST PETER P [DE], et al); | [XAI]FR2727847 (C & D BIOMEDICAL [FR]); | [XAI]US2012283691 (BARNES ERIK [US], et al); | [XAI]US2018168667 (GERMAIN AARON [US], et al) | by applicant | US2018361055 |