EP4006113 - COATING AGENT FOR OIL SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOK Corporation 12-15, Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8585 / JP | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YASUNAGA, Natsumi c/o NOK Corporation 8, Aza Tsuzukibori, Nagaigawa Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 960-1102 / JP | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/22] | Beckmann, Claus Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20842952.2 | 30.06.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020JP25688 | Priority number, date | JP20190136651 | 25.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019136651 | [2022/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021014902 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4006113 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C09D109/00, C09D191/06, F16J15/3284, C09D7/65 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
C09D191/06 (EP,KR,US);
C09D109/00 (KR,US);
C09D115/00 (CN);
B05D5/083 (EP);
B05D7/02 (EP);
C08J7/0427 (EP);
C08J7/046 (EP);
C08L91/06 (KR);
C09D119/006 (EP);
C09D5/00 (EP);
C09D7/20 (EP,KR,US);
C09D7/45 (EP);
C09D7/65 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C09D7/68 (EP);
C09D7/69 (EP,KR,US);
F16J15/324 (EP);
F16J15/3284 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B05D2401/10 (EP);
B05D2501/10 (EP);
B05D2503/00 (EP);
B05D2506/15 (EP);
B05D2518/10 (EP);
B05D2602/00 (EP);
C08J2307/00 (EP);
C08J2409/00 (EP);
C08J2427/18 (EP);
C08J2483/06 (EP);
C08J2491/06 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D115/00, C08L91/06, C08L83/04, C08L27/18 (CN);
C09D119/006, C08L83/04, C08L27/18, C08L91/08 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSMITTEL FÜR ÖLDICHTUNG | [2022/22] | English: | COATING AGENT FOR OIL SEAL | [2022/22] | French: | AGENT DE REVÊTEMENT POUR JOINT ÉTANCHE À L'HUILE | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2022 | Translation filed | 17.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 07.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2006292160 (NOK CORP) [A] 1-9* claims 1-2 *; | [A]WO2016018123 (LG HAUSYS LTD [KR]) [A] 1-9 * claims 1-8 *; | [A]EP3272820 (NOK CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * examples 1-4; claims 1-3 * | International search | [A]JPH09109703 (ACROSS CO) [A] 1-9 * 1-2, [0001] [0007] [0032], 8, 44-45, 49-50 *; | [A]JP3893985B (N O K) [A] 1-9 * [0023]-[0027], 1-4 *; | [A]JP2007332269 (NOK CORP) [A] 1-9 * [0030], 1, 1-5 *; | [A]JP2008189892 (NOK CORP) [A] 1-9 * [0001 ] [0015]-[0018] [0020] [0023] [0036] [0041 ], 1, 6 *; | [A]CN108587404 (GUANGDONG TIANCHENG SEALS CO LTD) [A] 1-9* 1, [0005], 1 * | by applicant | JP3893985B | JP4873120B | WO2016132982 |