EP4004422 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TRANSIENT MITIGATION DEVICE IN CONTINUOUS PIPELINES FOR SURGE IMPACT CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/22] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRANSIENT MITIGATION DEVICE IN CONTINUOUS PIPELINES FOR SURGE IMPACT CONTROL | ||
[2024/14] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smart Pipe Company, Inc. 1319 W Sam Houston Pkwy N Houston, TX 77043 / US | [2024/22] |
Former [2022/22] | For all designated states Smart Pipe Company Inc. 1319 W Sam Houston Pkwy N Houston TX 77043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LITTLESTAR, Gary, Dean 1319 W Sam Houston Pkwy N Houston, TX 77043 / US | 02 /
LITTLESTAR, Chris, Dean 1319 W Sam Houston Pkwy N Houston, TX 77043 / US | 03 /
EKELUND, Aron, Robert 1319 W Sam Houston Pkwy N Houston, TX 77043 / US | 04 /
MANDICH, Ivan, Capistran 131 Nursery Av. Metairie, LA 70005 / US | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/22] | Prock, Thomas Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 20843192.4 | 23.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020US43302 | Priority number, date | US201962877501P | 23.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962877501 P | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021016470 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4004422 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/04, F16L55/054, G01M3/00, B29C53/08, B29C65/00, G01H3/10 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
F16L55/054 (EP);
F16L55/053 (US);
F16L55/041 (US);
G01H3/00 (US);
G01H3/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/22] | F16L55/04, F16L55/054, G01M3/00, B29C53/08, B29C65/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR TRANSIENTE ABSCHWÄCHUNGSVORRICHTUNG IN KONTINUIERLICHEN ROHRLEITUNGEN FÜR DRUCKSTOSSREGELUNG | [2024/14] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TRANSIENT MITIGATION DEVICE IN CONTINUOUS PIPELINES FOR SURGE IMPACT CONTROL | [2024/14] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DISPOSITIF D'ATTÉNUATION DE TRANSITOIRES DANS DES TUYAUX CONTINUS POUR LUTTER CONTRE L'IMPACT DES SURPRESSIONS | [2024/14] |
Former [2022/22] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR TRANSIENTE ABSCHWÄCHUNGSVORRICHTUNG IN KONTINUIERLICHEN ROHRLEITUNGEN FÜR DRUCKSTOSSREGELUNG | ||
Former [2022/22] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRANSIENT MITIGATION DEVICE IN CONTINUOUS PIPELINES FOR SURGE IMPACT CONTROL | ||
Former [2022/22] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DISPOSITIF D'ATTÉNUATION DE TRANSITOIRES DANS DES TUYAUX CONTINUS POUR LUTTER CONTRE L'IMPACT DES SURTENSIONS | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 15.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.08.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2712831 (DAY GROVER A) | International search | [A]US3473565 (BLENDERMANN LOUIS) [A] 1-9* , entire document; *; | [A]US3874417 (CLAY ROBERT B) [A] 1-9 * , entire document; *; | [A]US4500487 (CHRISTIE ALAN M [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * , entire document; *; | [A]US6293311 (BUSHI JOHN C [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * , entire document; *; | [A]US2015345688 (KERSEY ALAN D [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * , entire document; *; | [A]US2017315567 (GRAFFIN ANDRÉ JEAN JACQUES [US]) [A] 1-9 * , entire document; *; | [AD]US2019219473 (LITTLESTAR GARY [US], et al) [AD] 1-9 * , entire document; * | by applicant | US2712831 |