EP4005827 - CONTROL METHOD, CONTROL DEVICE, CONTROL SYSTEM, AND TIRE TESTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORI, Ryosuke c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION, 1-1, Kyobashi 3- chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/22] | Oxley, Robin John George Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 20843231.0 | 21.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020JP28336 | Priority number, date | JP20190134887 | 22.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019134887 | [2022/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021015212 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4005827 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60C19/00, G01M17/007, G01M17/02, B60W30/14, G05D1/00, G05D1/02 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
G01M17/025 (EP);
G01M17/02 (EP,CN,US);
B60W50/0098 (EP);
B60W60/00 (EP);
G01M17/007 (CN,US);
B60W2050/0025 (EP);
B60W2050/0075 (EP);
B60W2420/403 (EP);
B60W2420/408 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/22] | B60C19/00, G01M17/007, G01M17/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | STEUERVERFAHREN, STEUERVORRICHTUNG, STEUERUNGSSYSTEM UND REIFENPRÜFVERFAHREN | [2022/22] | English: | CONTROL METHOD, CONTROL DEVICE, CONTROL SYSTEM, AND TIRE TESTING METHOD | [2022/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE, DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE, SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE ET PROGRAMME D'ESSAI DE PNEU | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2022 | Translation filed | 20.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 29.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2016282468 (GRUVER DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1,3-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0028] - [0037] - [0 39] , [0042] , [0044] , [0063] - [0065] - [0088] , [0136] - [0138] *[A] 2,9 | International search | [A]JPH0836691 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-9 * [0029]-[0064] *; | [A]JP2013092452 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 9 * [0020] *; | [A]CN109187042 (UNIV TONGJI) [A] 1-9 * [0038]-[0048] *; | [A]CN109668742 (SUZHOU FENGTU INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * [0097]-[0107] *; | [PA]JP2020006718 (ZMP CO LTD) [PA] 1-9* [0056]-[0066] *; | [PA]JP2020012711 (BRIDGESTONE CORP, et al) [PA] 1-9 * [0027]-[0061] * |