EP3904142 - VEHICLE BATTERY FIRE DETECTION DEVICE AND DETECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 19.07.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/13] |
Former [2021/44] | For all designated states LG ENERGY SOLUTION, LTD. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROH, Tae Hwan LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
AHN, Hyung Jun LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Sung Gon LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Su Chang LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Hui Jeong LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 06 /
SON, Do Wung LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | 01 /
ROH, Tae Hwan Daejeon 34122 / KR | ||
02 /
AHN, Hyung Jun Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Sung Gon Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
04 /
KIM, Su Chang Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
05 /
LEE, Hui Jeong Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
06 /
SON, Do Wung Daejeon 34122 / KR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 20844124.6 | 29.06.2020 | [2021/44] | WO2020KR08460 | Priority number, date | KR20190089225 | 23.07.2019 Original published format: KR 20190089225 | [2021/44] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021015436 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3904142 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60L3/00, B60L58/18, H01M10/42, G01R31/3835, B60L50/64 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
H01M10/425 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B60L3/0046 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B60L3/00 (CN);
B60L3/0038 (EP);
B60L3/0092 (EP);
B60L50/64 (EP);
B60L58/18 (CN,KR);
G01R31/3835 (CN,KR);
H01M10/42 (CN);
H01M10/48 (EP);
H01M10/486 (EP,US);
H01M50/20 (CN);
H01M50/249 (KR);
H01M50/30 (EP);
H01M50/3425 (CN,KR);
B60L2240/545 (EP,CN,KR);
B60L2240/547 (CN,KR);
B60L2250/10 (CN,KR);
B60L2270/12 (EP);
B60Y2400/302 (KR);
B60Y2400/306 (CN,KR,US);
H01M2010/4271 (EP,US);
H01M2010/4278 (CN,KR);
H01M2200/20 (EP);
H01M2220/20 (EP,CN,KR);
Y02E60/10 (KR);
Y02T10/70 (KR);
Y02T90/16 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/44] | B60L3/00, B60L58/18, H01M10/42, G01R31/3835 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BRANDDETEKTION BEI EINER FAHRZEUGBATTERIE | [2021/44] | English: | VEHICLE BATTERY FIRE DETECTION DEVICE AND DETECTION METHOD | [2021/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION D'INCENDIE DE BATTERIE DE VÉHICULE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION | [2021/44] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2021 | Translation filed | 26.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 06.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6204769 (ARAI YOICHI [JP], et al); | [XI]EP3249737 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]); | [XI]US2018026312 (HINTERBERGER MICHAEL [DE], et al); | [XI]JP2019057470 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [XI]US2019152332 (BERTNESS KEVIN I [US]) | International search | [A]JP2011023302 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-7* See paragraphs [0021]-[0034] and figure 3. *; | [Y]KR20110077774 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-7 * See paragraphs [0016]-[0046] and figures 1 and 2. *; | [A]KR20130042088 (SONG YEONG KIL [KR], et al) [A] 1-7 * See paragraphs [0023]-[0034] and figure 2. *; | [A]KR20160104867 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-7 * See paragraphs [0041]-[0049] and figures 2-5. *; | [Y]JP2019057470 (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 1-7 * See paragraphs [0013]-[0040] and figure 4. * | by applicant | KR20130028023 | KR20140051704 | KR20190089225 |