EP4004411 - FLUID-FLOW CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ham-Let (Israel-Canada) Ltd. 1 Hayotzer Street Ziporit, P.O. Box 824 1710801 Nof Hagalil / IL | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARGOL, Boris 1710801 Nof Hagalil / IL | 02 /
MAYZELS, Shaya 1710801 Nof Hagalil / IL | 03 /
MIMRAN, Arik 1710801 Nof Hagalil / IL | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/22] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20845014.8 | 23.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020IL50822 | Priority number, date | IL20190268254 | 24.07.2019 Original published format: IL 26825419 | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021014451 | Date: | 28.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4004411 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 28.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/52, F16K31/02, F16K31/122, C23C16/455, H01L21/02, F16K37/00, F16K7/16, F16K31/00 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
F16K31/004 (EP,KR);
F04B43/02 (IL,KR);
F16K7/16 (EP,KR);
F16K31/006 (EP,KR,US);
F16K31/005 (EP);
F16K31/007 (US);
F16K31/1221 (EP,KR,US);
F16K31/1262 (KR);
F16K37/0041 (EP);
F16K37/005 (EP,KR);
F16K7/126 (US);
F16K7/14 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/22] | F16K1/52, F16K31/02, F16K31/122, C23C16/455, H01L21/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | FLUIDFLUSSSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/22] | English: | FLUID-FLOW CONTROL DEVICE | [2022/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'ÉCOULEMENT DE FLUIDE | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 22.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2051312 (MARTONAIR LTD); | [A]JPS6440776 (KOGANEI LTD); | [Y]JPH04370401 (CKD CORP); | [Y]EP0756118 (OHMI TADAHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US6041814 (KOUKETSU MASAYUKI [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2010054792 (HOERBIGER AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECH [DE], et al); | [I]US2013167843 (KIMM GARDNER [US], et al); | [A]EP2639483 (MSP CORP [US]); | [XYI]DE202018103257U (HOERBIGER AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHNIK HOLDING GMBH [DE]) | International search | [A]US4695034 (SHIMIZU TETSUO [JP], et al); | [A]US8181932 (MATSUMOTO ATSUSHI [JP], et al); | [XA]WO2019059043 (FUJIKIN KK [JP]) |