EP4076779 - BENDING MACHINE COMPRISING AN INSPECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRUMPF Maschinen Austria GmbH & Co. KG. Industriepark 24 4061 Pasching / AT | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOHLBERGER, Christian Taubenstraße 3 4240 Freistadt / AT | 02 /
LUSTIG, Stefan Nußböckstraße 60/3 4060 Leonding / AT | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Burger, Hannes Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20845374.6 | 16.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020AT60471 | Priority number, date | AT20190051133 | 19.12.2019 Original published format: AT 511332019 | [2022/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021119704 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4076779 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4076779 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B21D5/00, G01B11/02 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
B21D5/004 (EP,AT);
B21D5/006 (EP,AT);
B21D5/02 (AT);
G01B11/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIEGEMASCHINE MIT EINER KONTROLLEINRICHTUNG | [2022/43] | English: | BENDING MACHINE COMPRISING AN INSPECTION DEVICE | [2022/43] | French: | MACHINE À CINTRER POURVUE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 14.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 06.12.2023 | |
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5531087 (KITABAYASHI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 25 * * column 11, line 24 - line 38; figures 1,3,5 *; | [A]WO2008119090 (TRUMPF MASCHINEN AUSTRIA GMBH [AT], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 20, line 25 - page 22, line 2; figure 1 *; | [A]EP2674232 (AMADA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0030]; figure 1 * |