EP3844577 - SCHEDULING ROBOTS FOR ROBOTIC PROCESS AUTOMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UiPath, Inc. 90 Park Avenue, 20th Floor New York, NY 10016 / US | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANNOURA, Daniel c/o UiPath, Inc. 90 Park Avenue, 20th Floor New York, NY 10016 / US | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/27] | Zoli, Filippo Brunacci & Partners S.r.l. Via Pietro Giardini, 625 41125 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 20845653.3 | 03.09.2020 | [2021/27] | WO2020US49281 | Priority number, date | US201916689193 | 20.11.2019 Original published format: US201916689193 | [2021/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021101616 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3844577 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042, G05B19/418, G06Q10/06, G06F9/46, G06F21/30, G06F21/60, G06F9/48, G06F21/62, G06Q10/10, H04L67/125 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
H04L67/125 (EP,US);
G05B19/042 (KR);
G06F21/604 (EP,CN);
B25J9/1661 (US);
B25J9/1689 (US);
G05B19/41865 (KR);
G06F21/30 (KR);
G06F21/44 (EP);
G06F21/602 (KR);
G06F9/46 (KR);
G06F9/4843 (EP);
G06Q10/0631 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/27] | G05B19/042, G05B19/418, G06Q10/06, G06F9/46, G06F21/30, G06F21/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Title | German: | PLANUNG VON ROBOTERN FÜR ROBOTISCHE PROZESSAUTOMATISIERUNG | [2021/27] | English: | SCHEDULING ROBOTS FOR ROBOTIC PROCESS AUTOMATION | [2021/27] | French: | PLANIFICATION DE ROBOTS POUR AUTOMATISATION DE PROCESSUS ROBOTIQUE | [2021/27] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 06.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006075024 (ZIRCHER WILLIAM E [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-13,15 * paragraphs [0012] - [0127] * [I] 4,6,14; | [X]US2019147382 (KRISHNAMURTHY JAYARAMAN [IN]) [X] 1-3,10-12 * paragraphs [0034] - [0040]; figures 3B, 4 *; | [A]US2019171845 (DOTAN-COHEN DIKLA [IL], et al) [A] 1-3,10-12* paragraphs [0031] - [0047] - [0105] - [0109] * | International search | [A]US2017173784 (SHAH RUCHI RAJAN [IN], et al) [A] 1-33; | [A]US2018197123 (PARIMELAZHAGAN GANESH RAJ MOHAN [IN], et al) [A] 1-33; | [A]CN109684054 (BEIJING HUILIU TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-33; | [A]US2019147382 (KRISHNAMURTHY JAYARAMAN [IN]) [A] 1-33; | [A]US2019303779 (VAN BRIGGLE CHRIS [US], et al)[A] 1-33 | by applicant | US2006075024 | US2019147382 | US2019171845 |