EP4084774 - DEODORANT AND PERSONAL CARE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rem Brands, Inc. 60 Cummings Drive Walton, Kentucky 41094 / US | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, David 60 Cummings Drive Walton, Kentucky 41094 / US | 02 /
SCHNEIDER, Jonathan 60 Cummings Drive Walton, Kentucky 41094 / US | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/45] | Kador & Partner PartG mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20845744.0 | 29.12.2020 | [2022/45] | WO2020US67327 | Priority number, date | US201962955121P | 30.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962955121 P | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021138335 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4084774 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/46, A61Q15/00, A61Q17/00, A61Q19/10 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
A61Q15/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/42 (US);
A61K8/466 (EP);
A61Q17/005 (EP);
A61Q19/10 (EP);
A61K2800/48 (US);
A61K2800/77 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | DEODORANT UND KÖRPERPFLEGEZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2022/45] | English: | DEODORANT AND PERSONAL CARE COMPOSITIONS | [2022/45] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DÉODORANTES ET DE SOIN PERSONNEL | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 28.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4110428 (KUHN JOHANNES ANDRIES, et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-10,17,18,20-22 * column 3, line 48 - column 3, line 51 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 3 * * column 4, line 25 - column 4, line 37 * * claim 1 * [I] 3,6,7,11-16,19; | [X]RO114628 (S C SINTOFARM S A [RO]) [X] 1,4,5,11-16,19,22 * abstract * * example 1 *; | [XI]US2003162755 (SCHNEIDER CHARLES A [US], et al) [X] 1-5,11-19,22-26 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0119] * [I] 6,7,20,21; | [XI]US2006073995 (SCHNEIDER DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1-4,11-16,19,22-25 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0034] * * examples 1-3 * [I] 5-7,17,18,26; | [XI]WO2007022453 (SAT INC [US]) [X] 1-5,11-16,19,22-26 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0047] * [I] 6,7,17,18,20,21; | [X]US2009227485 (SCHNEIDER DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1-5,11-19,22* examples 1, 2 *; | [XI]WO2011143376 (SCHNEIDER DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1-5,11-15,17-19,22-25 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0068] * [I] 6-10,16,20,21,26; | [XI]US2011301241 (SCHNEIDER DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1-7,11-19,22-24,26 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0070] * [I] 20,21; | [XI]US2016158404 (SCHNEIDER DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1-5,11-19,22-24,26 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0016] * * column 91 * * examples 1-14, 19-24 * [I] 6,7,20,21 |