EP4070476 - HIERARCHICAL MULTI-TIER THROUGHPUT ASSIGNMENT FOR A SHARED THROUGHPUT SATELLITE NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Network Systems, LLC 11717 Exploration Lane Germantown, MD 20876 / US | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORRES, Robert J. 11717 Exploration Lane Germantown, Maryland 20876 / US | 02 /
KADRICHU, Hanny 11717 Exploration Lane Germantown, Maryland 20876 / US | 03 /
BORDER, John L. 11717 Exploration Lane Germantown, Maryland 20876 / US | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Horler, Philip John Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/41] | Jaeger, Michael David Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 20845837.2 | 29.12.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020US67358 | Priority number, date | US201916731473 | 31.12.2019 Original published format: US201916731473 | [2022/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021138356 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4070476 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
H04B7/18578 (EP);
H04L43/0888 (US);
H04B7/185 (US);
H04L12/66 (US);
H04L41/5003 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | HIERARCHISCHE MEHRSTUFIGE DURCHSATZZUTEILUNG FÜR EIN SATELLITENNETZWERK MIT GEMEINSAMEM DURCHSATZ | [2022/41] | English: | HIERARCHICAL MULTI-TIER THROUGHPUT ASSIGNMENT FOR A SHARED THROUGHPUT SATELLITE NETWORK | [2022/41] | French: | ATTRIBUTION HIÉRARCHIQUE DE DÉBIT À NIVEAUX MULTIPLES POUR UN RÉSEAU SATELLITAIRE À DÉBIT PARTAGÉ | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 05.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2016072691 (XU JUN [US], et al) [X] 1,8,10,19 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086] * * figures 1-4 * [A] 3-7,9,12-18,20 [I] 2,11; | [XAI]US2018152351 (ROY SATYAJIT [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,8,10-13,16,20 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0116] * * figure 1 * [A] 6,7,17,18[I] 4,14 |