EP4005856 - DISCHARGE VEHICLE AND VEHICLE CHARGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BYD Company Limited No. 3009, BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Bingjian No. 3009, BYD Road, Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | 02 /
LV, Hao No. 3009, BYD Road, Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | 03 /
QI, Axi No. 3009, BYD Road, Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | 04 /
YANG, Zhifei No. 3009, BYD Road, Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 20846164.0 | 30.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020CN105882 | Priority number, date | CN201910703490 | 31.07.2019 Original published format: CN201910703490 | [2022/22] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021018253 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4005856 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60L53/14 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
B60L53/22 (EP);
B60L53/14 (EP,CN);
B60L53/53 (US);
B60L15/32 (US);
B60L53/18 (US);
B60L53/20 (EP,CN,US);
H02J7/007 (US);
H02M7/5387 (US);
H02P27/06 (US);
B60L2210/12 (EP);
B60L2210/14 (EP);
H02J2207/20 (US);
H02P2201/11 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | ENTLADUNGSFAHRZEUG UND FAHRZEUGLADESYSTEM | [2022/22] | English: | DISCHARGE VEHICLE AND VEHICLE CHARGING SYSTEM | [2022/22] | French: | VÉHICULE DE DÉCHARGE ET SYSTÈME DE CHARGE DE VÉHICULE | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2022 | Translation filed | 28.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 16.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP5945936B (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,3-5,9-11 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 3] , [00 5] * * figures 1, 4, 6, 7, 18 * [Y] 6-8,12-15 [I] 2; | [Y]CN207916598U (BAIC ZHENJIANG AUTOMOBILE CO LTD) [Y] 6-8,12-15 * paragraph [0024] ** figures 1-3 * |