EP3986763 - METHODS FOR TRANSITIONING BETWEEN AUTONOMOUS DRIVING MODES IN LARGE VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waymo LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATNAIK, Vijaysai 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
GROSSMAN, William 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 20846500.5 | 14.07.2020 | [2022/17] | WO2020US41927 | Priority number, date | US201962879571P | 29.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962879571 P | US201916548960 | 23.08.2019 Original published format: US201916548960 | US201916548980 | 23.08.2019 Original published format: US201916548980 | [2022/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021021427 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3986763 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/00, G08G1/0967, G08G1/14, B60W60/00, B60W40/10, B60W40/02, B60W10/20, G05D1/00, B60W50/00, B60W30/165, B62D15/02, G06V20/58 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G08G1/22 (EP,US);
B60W60/001 (EP,CN);
G05D1/0088 (US);
B60W10/20 (EP,CN);
B60W30/06 (US);
B60W30/165 (EP,CN);
B62D15/026 (EP);
B62D15/0285 (EP);
G05D1/0214 (US);
G05D1/0231 (US);
G05D1/0295 (US);
G05D1/249 (US);
G05D1/617 (US);
G05D1/695 (US);
G05D1/81 (US);
G06V20/584 (EP,US);
G08G1/096725 (EP,US);
G08G1/096791 (EP,US);
G08G1/143 (EP);
G08G1/146 (EP);
H04W12/06 (EP);
H04W12/77 (EP);
H04W4/46 (EP);
B60W2554/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/17] | B60W60/00, B60W40/10, B60W40/02, B60W10/20, G05D1/00, B60W50/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERGANG ZWISCHEN AUTONOMEN FAHRZUSTÄNDEN BEI GROSSFAHRZEUGEN | [2022/17] | English: | METHODS FOR TRANSITIONING BETWEEN AUTONOMOUS DRIVING MODES IN LARGE VEHICLES | [2022/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE TRANSITION ENTRE DES MODES DE CONDUITE AUTONOME DANS DE GRANDS VÉHICULES | [2022/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 15.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017344023 (LAUBINGER LORENZ [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10,11,14,15 * claims 1-23 * * figures 1-39 * * paragraphs [0068] - [0071] - [0074] * * paragraphs [0078] , [0080] * * paragraph [0082] * * paragraphs [0096] , [0098] , [0109] * * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0126] * * paragraphs [0134] - [0138] - [0143] , [ 161] , [0162] , [ 168] * * paragraphs [0196] , [0197] * * paragraph [0224] * * paragraph [0214] - paragraph [0220] * [I] 9,12,13; | [A]WO2018147041 (SONY SEMICONDUCTOR SOLUTIONS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | EP3582205 [ ] (SONY SEMICONDUCTOR SOLUTIONS CORP [JP]) [ ] * claims 1-14 * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0085] ** figures 1-12 * | International search | [Y]KR101102408B (INSPRIT CO LTD [KR])[Y] 21-40; | [Y]US2016318510 (HESS FELIX [DE]) [Y] 21-40; | [Y]JP2019046034 (DAIMLER AG) [Y] 11,12,18; | [AX]US2019204853 (MILLER JR T STEPHEN [US], et al) [A] 21-40 [X] 1,2,6-10,13-17,19,20; | [Y]US2019206262 (SIN GEUN OK [KR]) [Y] 3-5 | by applicant | US2017344023 | WO2018147041 |