EP3976523 - CRANE RISK LOGIC APPARATUS AND SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR USE OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wiethorn, Jim D. 625 Industrial Boulevard Sugar Land, Texas 77478 / US | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20847050.0 | 28.07.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020US43883 | Priority number, date | US201962879928P | 29.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962879928 P | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021021812 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3976523 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B66C13/48, B66C19/00, B66C13/04, B66C13/06, B66C13/08, B66C13/46, B66C15/06, G01W1/10, G06Q50/08, G06Q10/00 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
B66C13/16 (EP,US);
B66C15/065 (EP,US);
B66C13/46 (EP);
B66C23/905 (US);
G01W1/10 (EP);
G06Q10/0635 (EP);
G06Q10/20 (EP);
G06Q50/08 (EP);
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP);
H04Q9/02 (US);
H04W4/021 (US);
B66C23/16 (US);
B66C23/36 (US);
G01W2203/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/14] | B66C13/48, B66C19/00, B66C13/04, B66C13/06, B66C13/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | KRANRISIKOLOGIKVORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2022/14] | English: | CRANE RISK LOGIC APPARATUS AND SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR USE OF SAME | [2022/14] | French: | APPAREIL LOGIQUE DE RISQUE DE GRUE AINSI QUE SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SON UTILISATION | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 31.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN101391725 (SHANGHAI BUILDING SCIENCE RES [CN]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]EP2246287 (VINATI GROUP SRL [IT]) [A] 1,7,8 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0109] ** figure - *; | [Y]KR20140096831 (HYUNDAI SAMHO HEAVY IND CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 6 * abstract *; | [YA]EP2894529 (MANITOWOC CRANE COMPANIES LLC [US]) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0049] * * figure - * [A] 1,3,7,8; | [Y]JP2018095372 (TADANO LTD) [Y] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A] - LI ZHUFENG ET AL, "Data acquisition and management of remote crane monitoring system based on CAN bus", 2015 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MECHATRONICS AND AUTOMATION (ICMA), IEEE, doi:10.1109/ICMA.2015.7237873, ISBN 978-1-4799-7097-1, (20150802), pages 2460 - 2465, (20150902), XP033216774 [A] 1,6-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICMA.2015.7237873 | International search | [A]US2003201394 (PEOPLES WILLIAM [US]) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]US2007050115 (DISCENZO FREDERICK M [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]US2007284327 (GONZALEZ JESUS [ES], et al) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]US2010214094 (GIVENS GERALD E [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]US9302890 (VOGT PAUL E [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]EP3059200 (NISSAN MOTOR MFG UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]US2017328511 (WIETHORN JIM D [US]) [A] 1-10* entire document *; | [A] - ANEZIRIS O N; Papazoglou I A; Mud M L; Damen M; Kuiper J; Baksteen H; Ale B J; Bellamy L J; Hale A R; Bloemhoff A; Post J G; Oh J, "Towards risk assessment for crane activities", ScienceDirect, (20070000), vol. 46, no. 6, doi:10.1016/j.ssci.2007.11.012, pages 872 - 884, XP022713660 [A] 1-10 * entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ssci.2007.11.012 |