EP4003263 - COMPONENTS OF OPEN LIQUID DRUG TRANSFER SYSTEMS AND A ROBOTIC SYSTEM EMPLOYING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Equashield Medical Ltd. P.O.B. 26 2495900 Tefen Industrial Park / IL | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRIHELI, Marino 7 Marc Chagall Street 6967203 Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
TAVOR, Raanan 18 Vardit Street POB 479 2014200 Yuvalim / IL | 03 /
SHEM-TOV, Eric 44 Harimon Street 4725144 Ramat Hasharon / IL | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 20847167.2 | 27.07.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020IL50829 | Priority number, date | IL20190268368 | 30.07.2019 Original published format: IL 26836819 | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021019532 | Date: | 04.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4003263 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 04.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/20, B65B3/00 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
A61J1/201 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61J1/2075 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61J1/20 (KR);
A61J1/065 (KR);
A61J1/10 (KR);
A61J1/1406 (KR);
A61J1/2048 (KR);
A61J1/2055 (EP,KR,US);
A61J1/2065 (IL);
A61J1/2082 (EP,IL,US);
A61J1/2086 (KR,US);
A61J1/2096 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61J3/002 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B25J11/009 (KR);
B25J18/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | KOMPONENTEN VON OFFENEN FLÜSSIGEN WIRKSTOFFÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEMEN UND ROBOTERSYSTEM UNTER VERWENDUNG DERSELBEN | [2022/22] | English: | COMPONENTS OF OPEN LIQUID DRUG TRANSFER SYSTEMS AND A ROBOTIC SYSTEM EMPLOYING THEM | [2022/22] | French: | COMPOSANTS DE SYSTÈMES DE TRANSFERT DE MÉDICAMENT LIQUIDE OUVERTS ET SYSTÈME ROBOTIQUE LES METTANT EN OEUVRE | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 13.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007156112 (WALSH MARY K [US]) [A] 1-14 * figures 3-4 ** paragraphs [0034] - [0037] *; | [A]US8820365 (AGUERRE JEAN-PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * figures 1-5 * * column 1, line 42 - column 2, line 3 *; | [Y]US2016200462 (KRIHELI MARINO [IL], et al) [Y] 1-8 * figures 1, 5, 6A-C, 10 * * paragraphs [0028] - [0034] - [ 139] , [ 147] , [ 152] *; | [Y]US9610222 (KRIHELI MARINO [IL], et al) [Y] 1-12 * figures 28-31 * * column 8, line 20 - line 48 * * column 17, line 25 - column 18, line 12 *; | [YP]WO2019167035 (EQUASHIELD MEDICAL LTD [IL]) [YP] 9-12 * figures 2-10 * * page 6, line 24 - page 12, line 10 * | International search | [A]US4743243 (VAILLANCOURT VINCENT L [US]) [A] 1 * see abstract hydrophobic filter in a vented filter assembly *; | [YA]US2008172024 (YOW D GREGORY [US]) [Y] 1-3,8 * Figs 1, 2 paragraphs 1, 31, 45, 46 Figs 1, 2 * [A] 4-7,9-14; | [A]US2015231034 (LEV NIMROD [IL], et al) [A] 1,9-14 * Figs 4, 5 para 26 *; | [A]US2015359709 (KRIHELI MARINO [IL], et al) [A] 9-14 * figs 2, 5, 8, 17, 19, 22 and description thereof *; | [Y]US2016200462 (KRIHELI MARINO [IL], et al) [Y] 1-3,8 * Figs. 2, 3 para 142, 145 *; | [A] - "Vented Vial Adapter", West Pharma, (20171222), URL: https://www.westpharma.com/products/reconstitution-and-transfer-systems/vial-adapters, XP055788545 [A] 1,9-14 | by applicant | US2016200462 | US9610222 | WO2019167035 |