EP3881981 - AUTOMATIC TEACHING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAIKISHA LTD. 17-1, Nishishinjuku 8-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-6129 / JP | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAYAMA, Genji c/o TAIKISHA LTD. 17-1 Nishishinjuku 8-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 1606129 / JP | 02 /
HIGASHI, Yoshio c/o TAIKISHA LTD. 17-1 Nishishinjuku 8-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 1606129 / JP | 03 /
HAYASHI, Yoshikazu c/o TAIKISHA LTD. 17-1 Nishishinjuku 8-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 1606129 / JP | 04 /
SUZUKI, Hiroyuki c/o TAIKISHA LTD. 17-1 Nishishinjuku 8-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 1606129 / JP | 05 /
SHIWA, Hideo c/o TAIKISHA LTD. 17-1 Nishishinjuku 8-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 1606129 / JP | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | LBP Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/38] | Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 20848684.5 | 27.08.2020 | [2021/38] | WO2020JP32317 | Priority number, date | JP20200009997 | 24.01.2020 Original published format: JP 2020009997 | [2021/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021149295 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3881981 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/22, B25J9/16, B24B27/00, B25J11/00, G05B19/42, B24B19/26, // G01B11/24 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
B24B27/0038 (EP);
B25J9/0081 (CN);
G05B19/4207 (US);
B24B19/26 (EP);
B25J11/00 (CN);
B25J11/0065 (EP,CN);
B25J11/0075 (EP);
B25J9/16 (EP,CN);
B25J9/1661 (US);
B25J9/1664 (EP);
B25J9/1679 (EP,CN);
B25J9/1697 (EP,US);
G01B11/245 (EP);
G01B11/25 (EP);
G05B2219/36248 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/38] | B25J9/22, G05B19/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES LEHRSYSTEM | [2021/38] | English: | AUTOMATIC TEACHING SYSTEM | [2021/38] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ENSEIGNEMENT AUTOMATIQUE | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2021 | Translation filed | 08.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 10.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011282492 (KRAUSE KEN [US], et al); | [X]US2016271796 (BABU RAHUL [US]); | [X]US2018326591 (HÄUSLER KURT [AT]) | International search | [A]JPH0592345 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [Y]JPH05289722 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [Y]JPH06285762 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPH09179619 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]JPH09244723 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS); | [Y]JPH1063324 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2005004254 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y]JP2007065795 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y]JP2010276447 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]WO2018235430 (TAIKISHA KK [JP]); | [A]CN109976259 (NANJING INST TECH, et al) |