EP3984960 - PREPARATION METHOD FOR POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LHO, Eun Sol LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Sang Min LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
JUNG, Wang Mo LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Sung Bin LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Seul Ki LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 06 /
WANG, Wen Xiu LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 20850171.8 | 05.08.2020 | [2022/16] | WO2020KR10339 | Priority number, date | KR20190096996 | 08.08.2019 Original published format: KR 20190096996 | [2022/16] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021025464 | Date: | 11.02.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3984960 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3984960 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C01G53/00, H01M4/525, H01M4/505 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
C01G53/50 (EP);
C01G53/44 (KR);
H01M4/525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M4/131 (EP,US);
H01M4/1391 (EP);
H01M4/36 (EP);
H01M4/364 (EP);
H01M4/485 (EP);
H01M4/62 (EP,US);
C01P2002/52 (EP);
C01P2004/03 (EP);
C01P2004/61 (EP);
C01P2006/40 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR POSITIVELEKTRODENAKTIVMATERIAL FÜR SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2022/16] | English: | PREPARATION METHOD FOR POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR SECONDARY BATTERY | [2022/16] | French: | COPOLYMÈRE POUR ÉLECTROLYTE POLYMÈRE, ÉLECTROLYTE POLYMÈRE EN GEL LE COMPRENANT ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM | [2022/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2022 | Translation filed | 12.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 25.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0836238 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [I]WO2017095133 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [I] 1-10 * examples comp. ex. 1-2 *; | [I] - PARK KANG-JOON ET AL, "Improved Cycling Stability of Li[Ni 0.90 Co 0.05 Mn 0.05 ]O 2 Through Microstructure Modification by Boron Doping for Li-Ion Batteries", ADVANCED ENERGY MATERIALS, DE, vol. 8, no. 25, doi:10.1002/aenm.201801202, ISSN 1614-6832, (20180711), page 1801202, URL: https://api.wiley.com/onlinelibrary/tdm/v1/articles/10.1002%2Faenm.201801202, XP055791596 [I] 1-10 * page 2 - page 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/aenm.201801202 | International search | [A]KR20100042145 (IUCF HYU [KR]) [A] 1-10 * See claims 9-27. *; | [A]JP2010177024 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-10* See claims 1-5. *; | [A]KR20150013076 [A] 1-10 * See claims 12 and 20-26. *; | [X]KR20170063408 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 1-10 * See claim 1; and paragraphs [0128] and [0200]. *; | [A]JP2018104688 (AIST, et al) [A] 1-10 * See claims 5 and 11. * |