EP4012606 - METHOD FOR ESTIMATING AND PRESENTING PASSENGER FLOW, SYSTEM, AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Ming ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2022/24] | Application number, filing date | 20850349.0 | 07.08.2020 | [2022/24] | WO2020CN107975 | Priority number, date | CN201910727332 | 07.08.2019 Original published format: CN201910727332 | [2022/24] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021023310 | Date: | 11.02.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4012606 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06V10/20, G06V10/46, G06V20/52, G06V10/75, G06V10/82, G06V20/70, G06V40/10 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
G06V10/255 (EP,US);
G06V20/41 (CN,US);
G06Q50/40 (US);
G06V10/46 (EP);
G06V10/752 (EP);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06V20/46 (US);
G06V20/53 (EP,CN,US);
G06V20/70 (EP);
G06V40/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/24] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SCHÄTZEN UND DARSTELLEN VON FAHRGASTSTRÖMEN, SYSTEM UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/24] | English: | METHOD FOR ESTIMATING AND PRESENTING PASSENGER FLOW, SYSTEM, AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION ET DE PRÉSENTATION DE FLUX DE PASSAGERS, SYSTÈME ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2022/24] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2022 | Translation filed | 04.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 08.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN102496058 (BEIJING TELESOUND ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [X] 1,10,13 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0067]; figures 1-4 * [I] 2-9,11,12; | [I]CN109815787 (CLOUDMINDS SHENZHEN ROBOTICS SYSTEMS CO LTD) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0074]; figures 1-5 *; | [I]CN110059594 (MEGVII TECH LTD) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0069]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]CN110059581 (CHANGSHU INST TECH) [A] 1-13* paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0119]; figures 1-5 * |