EP3992977 - METHOD FOR MANAGING CORRECTION INFORMATION IN CONTINUOUS BLOOD GLUCOSE MEASUREMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states i-Sens, Inc. Seocho-dong 43 Banpo-daero 28-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06646 / KR | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Seung Chun Seocho-dong) 43, Banpo-daero 28-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06646 / KR | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | BCKIP Part mbB Siegfriedstraße 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/18] | BCKIP Siegfriedstraße 8 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20850434.0 | 18.03.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020KR03711 | Priority number, date | KR20190096796 | 08.08.2019 Original published format: KR 20190096796 | [2022/18] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021025261 | Date: | 11.02.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3992977 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G16H10/60, G16H10/20, G16H40/40, G16H40/63, A61B5/145, A61B5/00, H04M1/725, A61B5/1495, // H04M1/72412 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
G16H10/20 (EP);
G16H10/60 (KR);
A61B5/1495 (EP,US);
A61B5/0002 (EP,US);
A61B5/0024 (KR);
A61B5/14532 (EP,KR);
A61B5/4839 (EP);
G16H40/40 (EP);
G16H40/63 (EP);
H04M1/725 (KR);
H04Q9/00 (US);
A61B2560/0223 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | G16H10/60, A61B5/145, A61B5/00, H04M1/725 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG VON KORREKTURINFORMATIONEN IN EINEM KONTINUIERLICHEN BLUTZUCKERMESSSYSTEM | [2022/18] | English: | METHOD FOR MANAGING CORRECTION INFORMATION IN CONTINUOUS BLOOD GLUCOSE MEASUREMENT SYSTEM | [2022/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION D'INFORMATIONS CORRECTIVES DANS UN SYSTÈME DE MESURE EN CONTINU DE LA GLYCÉMIE | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2022 | Translation filed | 31.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 02.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2010191086 (TALBOT CARY D [US], et al) [X] 1,3-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0115] * [Y] 1-10; | [Y]EP2327984 (DEXCOM INC [US]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0428] * * paragraph [0601] - paragraph [0605] *; | [Y]US2016210099 (HAMPAPURAM HARI [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0105] ** paragraph [0133] *; | [Y]US2017286194 (MORRIS GARY A [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0111] * * paragraph [0133] * * paragraph [0174] - paragraph [0179] * | International search | [A]JPS5837570B (TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA) [A] 1-10 * See claims 1-6 and figures I and 2. *; | [Y]JP2011139942 (MEDTRONIC MINIMED INC) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0034]-[0069] and figures 1A-1D and 5E. *; | [Y]JP2014158970 (DEXCOM INC) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0584]-[0680], claims 22-26 and figure 16A. *; | [Y]JP2018509947 (DEXCOM INC.) [Y] 8-10 * See paragraphs [0118]-[0119] and figure 11. *; | [A]KR101998517B (ULSAN NAT INST SCIENCE & TECH UNIST [KR]) [A] 1-10* See paragraphs [0025]-[0042] and figures 7 and 2. * |