EP4010792 - SYSTEM, METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR AUTHENTICATING A TRANSACTION BASED ON BEHAVIORAL BIOMETRIC DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Visa International Service Association P.O. Box 8999 San Francisco, California 94128 / US | [2022/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALASUBRAMANIAN, Chandra, S. 22249 Douglas Rd. Shaker Heights, Ohio 44122 / US | 02 /
FISHER, Douglas 1121 Bruckner Circle Mountain View, California 94040 / US | 03 /
VONDRAK, Nicholas, Edward 962 Hall Street San Carlos, California 94070 / US | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [2022/24] | Application number, filing date | 20850512.3 | 07.08.2020 | [2022/24] | WO2020US45429 | Priority number, date | US201962884069P | 07.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962884069 P | US201962898200P | 10.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962898200 P | [2022/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021026464 | Date: | 11.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4010792 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/40, G06F3/0488, G06F17/00, G06F21/00, G06F21/32, G06N99/00, G06Q20/42 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
G06Q20/3278 (EP);
G06Q20/3821 (US);
G06F21/32 (EP,US);
G06Q20/20 (EP);
G06Q20/401 (EP);
G06Q20/40145 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/24] | G06F3/0488, G06F17/00, G06F21/00, G06F21/32, G06N99/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT ZUR AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG EINER TRANSAKTION AUF DER GRUNDLAGE VON BIOMETRISCHEN VERHALTENSDATEN | [2022/24] | English: | SYSTEM, METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR AUTHENTICATING A TRANSACTION BASED ON BEHAVIORAL BIOMETRIC DATA | [2022/24] | French: | SYSTÈME, PROCÉDÉ ET PRODUIT- PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR DESTINÉS À AUTHENTIFIER UNE TRANSACTION SUR LA BASE DE DONNÉES BIOMÉTRIQUES COMPORTEMENTALES | [2022/24] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 23.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2015363785 (PEREZ KRISTOFER [US], et al) [I] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [A]US2008113791 (WILLIAMS DAVID C [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2010115610 (TREDOUX GAVAN LEONARD [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2013073463 (DIMMICK JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2016057623 (DUTT DEEPAK CHANDRA [CA], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [A]US2016259924 (DUTT DEEPAK CHANDRA [CA], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A] - BAILEY et al., "User identification and authentication using multi-modal behavioral biometrics", Computers & Security, vol. 43, (20140325), pages 77 - 89, URL: http://robobrarian.info/b_pubs/CandSBailey.pdf, (20200929), XP029020684 [A] 1-20 * entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cose.2014.03.005 | by applicant | US2015363785 |