EP4082222 - ENCLOSURE FOR DIFFUSING SOUND BY REVERBERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FOCAL JMLab 108 Route de l'Avenir ZI Molina La Chazotte 42350 La Talaudière / FR | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAZES BOUCHET, Arnaud 22 Route de Roanne 42510 BALBIGNY / FR | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras Le Contemporain 50 Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 20851218.6 | 21.12.2020 | [2022/44] | WO2020FR52576 | Priority number, date | FR20190015555 | 24.12.2019 Original published format: FR 1915555 | [2022/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021130441 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4082222 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/34, G10K11/28 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
H04R1/345 (EP,US);
H04R1/025 (US);
H04R1/30 (US);
H04R1/34 (US);
H04R7/127 (US);
H04R7/18 (US);
G10K11/28 (EP);
H04R2201/34 (US);
H04R2400/11 (US);
H04R2400/13 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | GEHÄUSE ZUR SCHALLDÄMPFUNG DURCH NACHHALL | [2022/44] | English: | ENCLOSURE FOR DIFFUSING SOUND BY REVERBERATION | [2022/44] | French: | ENCEINTE DE DIFFUSION DE SON PAR REVERBERATION | [2022/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 23.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]ITRM20120086 (BASILE EMANUELE, et al); | [A]US2016119711 (DELAY MARK [US], et al); | [A]US2017026750 (MANSFIELD WARREN [US], et al); | [A]US2017325019 (BEZZOLA ANDRI [US], et al) |