EP4075983 - BIO-CONTROL METHOD FOR COMBATING THE PROPAGATION OF PHYTOPATHOGENIC FUNGI AND OOMYCETES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut national de recherche pour l'agriculture, l'alimentation et l'environnement 147 Rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | For all designated states Institut national d'enseignement supérieur pour l'agriculture, l'alimentation et l'environnement 42 Rue Scheffer 75116 Paris / FR | For all designated states UNIVERSITE D'ANGERS 40, rue de Rennes 49000 Angers / FR | [2024/35] |
Former [2022/43] | For all designated states Institut national de recherche pour l'agriculture, l'alimentation et l'environnement 147 rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Institut National Supérieur des Sciences Agronomiques, Agroalimentaires, Horticoles et du Paysage 65 rue de Saint Brieuc 35000 Rennes / FR | |||
For all designated states UNIVERSITE D'ANGERS 40, rue de Rennes 49000 Angers / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE CAM, Bruno 19 rue G. de la Celle 49770 LA MEIGNANNE / FR | 02 /
CAFFIER Valérie 20 Rue Sainte Emerance 49370 ERDRE-EN-ANJOU / FR | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20851322.6 | 21.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020FR52580 | Priority number, date | FR20190015276 | 20.12.2019 Original published format: FR 1915276 | [2022/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021123698 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4075983 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01N63/30, A01N65/00, A01P3/00 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
A01N63/30 (EP,US);
A01N63/00 (US);
A01N65/00 (EP);
A01P1/00 (US);
A01P3/00 (US)
| C-Set: |
A01N63/30, A01N63/30 (EP);
A01N65/00, A01N65/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | BIOKONTROLLVERFAHREN ZUM BEKÄMPFEN DER AUSBREITUNG VON PHYTOPATHOGENEN PILZEN UND OOMYCETEN | [2022/43] | English: | BIO-CONTROL METHOD FOR COMBATING THE PROPAGATION OF PHYTOPATHOGENIC FUNGI AND OOMYCETES | [2022/43] | French: | MÉTHODE DE BIO-CONTRÔLE POUR LUTTER CONTRE LA PROPAGATION DES CHAMPIGNONS ET OOMYCÈTES PHYTOPATHOGÈNES | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 27.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2019212975 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA STATE [US]) |