EP4081811 - DEVICE FOR DETECTING A FAULT USING MEMBER FOR MEASURING A COMMON MODE VOLTAGE IN AN ELECTRICAL NETWORK AND ELECTRICAL NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/44] | MEMBER FOR MEASURING A COMMON MODE VOLTAGE IN AN ELECTRICAL NETWORK AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING A FAULT USING SUCH A MEMBER | ||
[2023/33] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safran Electrical & Power Parc d'Activité Andromède 1 Rue Louis Blériot CS 80049 31702 Blagnac / FR | For all designated states CIMA, Lionel 18 Allée du Pressoir Viot 37540 Saint Cyr sur Loire / FR | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CIMA, Lionel 18 Allée du Pressoir Viot 37540 SAINT CYR SUR LOIRE / FR | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 20851410.9 | 22.12.2020 | [2022/44] | WO2020FR52602 | Priority number, date | FR20190015522 | 24.12.2019 Original published format: FR 1915522 | FR20190015523 | 24.12.2019 Original published format: FR 1915523 | [2022/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021130449 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4081811 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4081811 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/06, G01R15/16, H02H1/00, H02H3/42, G01R15/04 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
G01R31/086 (EP,US);
G01R15/06 (EP);
G01R15/16 (EP,US);
G01R15/181 (US);
G01R31/1272 (EP,US);
H02H1/0007 (US);
H02H1/0015 (EP,US);
H02H3/42 (EP);
H02H7/20 (US);
G01R15/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR FEHLERERKENNUNG MIT ELEMENT ZUR MESSUNG EINER GLEICHTAKTSPANNUNG IN EINEM ELEKTRISCHEN NETZWERK UND ELEKTRISCHES NETZWERK | [2023/33] | English: | DEVICE FOR DETECTING A FAULT USING MEMBER FOR MEASURING A COMMON MODE VOLTAGE IN AN ELECTRICAL NETWORK AND ELECTRICAL NETWORK | [2023/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION D'UNE DEFAILLANCE AVEC ORGANE DE MESURE D'UNE TENSION DE MODE COMMUN DANS UN RESEAU ELECTRIQUE ET RESEAU ELECTRIQUE | [2023/33] |
Former [2022/44] | ELEMENT ZUR MESSUNG EINER GLEICHTAKTSPANNUNG IN EINEM ELEKTRISCHEN NETZWERK UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FEHLERERKENNUNG MIT EINEM SOLCHEN ELEMENT | ||
Former [2022/44] | MEMBER FOR MEASURING A COMMON MODE VOLTAGE IN AN ELECTRICAL NETWORK AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING A FAULT USING SUCH A MEMBER | ||
Former [2022/44] | ORGANE DE MESURE D'UNE TENSION DE MODE COMMUN DANS UN RESEAU ELECTRIQUE ET DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION D'UNE DEFAILLANCE METTANT EN OEUVRE UN TEL ORGANE | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 29.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.01.2024 | BG | 31.01.2024 | ES | 31.01.2024 | FI | 31.01.2024 | HR | 31.01.2024 | LT | 31.01.2024 | LV | 31.01.2024 | NL | 31.01.2024 | PL | 31.01.2024 | SE | 31.01.2024 | NO | 30.04.2024 | RS | 30.04.2024 | GR | 01.05.2024 | IS | 31.05.2024 | PT | 31.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 31.01.2024 | |
BG | 31.01.2024 | ||
ES | 31.01.2024 | ||
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
LV | 31.01.2024 | ||
NL | 31.01.2024 | ||
PL | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
PT | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 31.01.2024 | |
BG | 31.01.2024 | ||
ES | 31.01.2024 | ||
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
NL | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 31.01.2024 | |
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 31.05.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE2122917 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE AG) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [A] 7-11; | [A]GB2007048 (HAZEMEIJER BV) [A] 1-11 * page 2, line 76 - page 5, line 127; figures 1-10; claims 1-20 *; | [A]US4763068 (SCHMITT ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 36 - column 5, line 32; figures 1-2; claims 1-19 *; | [A]DE10056988 (KG RITZ MESSWANDLER G M B H & [DE]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [XA]EP1437600 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0020] - [0030]; figure 1; claims 1-14 * [A] 7-11; | [A]US2012123708 (DONG XINZHOU [CN], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0070] - [0137]; figures 1-6; claims 1-20 *; | [XA]FR2976083 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [X] 1-6 * page 2, line 35 - page 4, line 24; figures 1-11; claims 1-13 * * page 6, line 24 - page 13, line 25 * [A] 7-11; | [XA]EP2720333 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS SAS [FR]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0044] - [0168]; figures 1-10; claims 1-20 * [A] 7-11 | by applicant | US10078105 |