EP4012115 - EXCAVATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 1-1, Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-6025 / JP | [2022/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIKAWARA, Riichi c/o SUMITOMO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 731-1, Naganumahara-cho, Inage-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 263-0001 / JP | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2022/24] | Application number, filing date | 20851444.8 | 07.08.2020 | [2022/24] | WO2020JP30520 | Priority number, date | JP20190148139 | 09.08.2019 Original published format: JP 2019148139 | [2022/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021029399 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4012115 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4012115 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/22, F15B11/00, E02F3/43, E02F9/20 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
E02F9/2235 (EP);
E02F9/2221 (KR);
E02F3/28 (CN);
E02F9/2282 (EP,US);
E02F3/36 (CN);
E02F3/435 (EP);
E02F9/00 (CN);
E02F9/08 (CN);
E02F9/121 (CN);
E02F9/20 (CN);
E02F9/2004 (KR);
E02F9/2012 (EP);
E02F9/2062 (CN);
E02F9/2083 (CN);
E02F9/22 (CN);
E02F9/2264 (CN);
E02F9/2285 (EP);
E02F9/2292 (EP,US);
E02F9/2296 (EP,US);
F15B11/028 (KR);
F15B11/0423 (EP);
F15B11/08 (US);
F15B13/042 (KR);
B60Y2200/412 (KR);
F15B21/087 (EP);
F15B2211/205 (KR);
F15B2211/20546 (EP);
F15B2211/3059 (EP);
F15B2211/30595 (EP);
F15B2211/3116 (EP);
F15B2211/329 (EP);
F15B2211/40507 (EP);
F15B2211/45 (EP);
F15B2211/615 (EP);
F15B2211/62 (EP);
F15B2211/6309 (EP);
F15B2211/6313 (EP);
F15B2211/6316 (EP);
F15B2211/6343 (EP);
F15B2211/6652 (EP);
F15B2211/6656 (EP);
F15B2211/7135 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/24] | E02F9/22, F15B11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAGGER | [2022/24] | English: | EXCAVATOR | [2022/24] | French: | EXCAVATRICE | [2022/24] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2022 | Translation filed | 04.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 10.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.10.2023 | CZ | 18.10.2023 | DK | 18.10.2023 | EE | 18.10.2023 | ES | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | LT | 18.10.2023 | LV | 18.10.2023 | NL | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RO | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SE | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | BG | 18.01.2024 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | PT | 19.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
CZ | 18.10.2023 | ||
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 18.10.2023 | |
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 18.10.2023 | |
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 18.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5575148 (HIRATA TOICHI [JP], et al) | International search | [Y]JP2014005866 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES, et al); | [XY]JP2015059591 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]WO2018105527 (SUMITOMO SHI CONSTR MACH CO [JP]) | by applicant | JPS4843105B | JP2019148139 |