EP4013772 - METHODS TO DETECT MTBR TAU ISOFORMS AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Washington University One Brookings Drive St. Louis, Missouri 63130 / US | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATEMAN, Randall c/o Washington University One Brookings Drive St. Louis, Missouri 63130 / US | 02 /
BARTHELEMY, Nicolas c/o Washington University One Brookings Drive St. Louis, Missouri 63130 / US | 03 /
HORIE, Kanta c/o Washington University One Brookings Drive St. Louis, Missouri 63130 / US | 04 /
SATO, Chihiro c/o Washington University One Brookings Drive St. Louis, Missouri 63130 / US | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 20851647.6 | 13.08.2020 | [2022/25] | WO2020US46224 | Priority number, date | US201962886165P | 13.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962886165 P | US202062970950P | 06.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062970950 P | US202063044836P | 26.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063044836 P | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021030615 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4013772 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, G01N33/68 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
G01N33/6896 (EP,IL,KR);
G01N33/6848 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G01N33/6893 (US);
A61P25/28 (KR);
C07K14/4711 (EP,IL,KR);
G01N1/34 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS VON MTBR-TAU-ISOFORMEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2022/25] | English: | METHODS TO DETECT MTBR TAU ISOFORMS AND USE THEREOF | [2022/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE DÉTECTION D'ISOFORMES TAU DE MTBR ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 29.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015253341 (MCAVOY THOMAS [US], et al); | [YP]WO2019213612 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US], et al); | International search | [Y]WO2014011972 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]); | [Y]US2015337030 (ABELIOVICH ASA [US]); | [Y]US2018201666 (KNIGHT DAVID EDWARD ORMONDE [GB], et al); | [Y]WO2018148593 (C2N DIAGNOSTICS LLC [US]) |