EP4016015 - OPTICAL FIBER SENSING SYSTEM, OPTICAL FIBER SENSING DEVICE, AND RESCUE REQUEST DETECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku 108-8001 Tokyo / JP | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YODA, Yukihide c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato- ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 02 /
OGURA, Naoto c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato- ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 03 /
AONO, Yoshiaki c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato- ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/25] | Reeve, Nicholas Edward Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 20852517.0 | 21.07.2020 | [2022/25] | WO2020JP28327 | Priority number, date | JP20190148296 | 13.08.2019 Original published format: JP 2019148296 | [2022/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021029196 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4016015 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01H9/00, E21F17/18, E21F11/00, G08B21/02, G08B27/00 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
G01H9/004 (EP,CN,US);
G08B25/006 (US);
G08B21/02 (EP);
G10L15/22 (US);
H04R23/008 (US);
G08B25/016 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/25] | G01H9/00, G08B21/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | GLASFASERSENSORSYSTEM, GLASFASERSENSORVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR RETTUNGSANFRAGEDETEKTION | [2022/25] | English: | OPTICAL FIBER SENSING SYSTEM, OPTICAL FIBER SENSING DEVICE, AND RESCUE REQUEST DETECTION METHOD | [2022/25] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION À FIBRE OPTIQUE, DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION À FIBRE OPTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE DEMANDE DE SECOURS | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2022 | Translation filed | 11.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 10.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/43] | 25.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2010506496 (NEC CORP) [X] 1-3,7-10,13-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0050]; figures 1-6 *; | [XI]CN105371942 (UNIV HEILONGJIANG SCIENCE & TECH) [X] 1-4,7-10,13-15 * pages 1-4; figures 1-2 * [I] 5,6,11,12; | US2017034682 [ ] (MATSUMASA HIRONORI [JP], et al) [ ] * paragraphs [0001] - [0128]; figures 1-14 *; | [A]JP2017033108 (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 5 * paragraphs [0001] - [0114]; figures 1-14 *; | [XI]CN109424365 (SUZHOU PENTASTAR OPTOELECTRONIC TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,10,12-14 * pages 1-3; figures 1-2 * [I] 5,11 | International search | [Y]JPH11332838 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [Y] 4-6,10-12,16-18 * claim 1, paragraphs [0046], [0048], fig. 14 *; | [Y]JP2009128984 (YAMAMOTO SANGYO KK, et al) [Y] 4-6,10-12,16-18 * paragraphs [0052], [0075], [0077], fig. 14 *; | [XY]JP2010506496 (DELAWARE STATE UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION, INC.) [X] 1-3,7-9,13-15 * fig. 1 fig. 1 * [Y] 4-6,10-12, 16-18; | [Y]JP2017033108 (FUJIFILM CORP) [Y] 6,12,18* fig. 8 * | by applicant | JP2001249035 | JP2019148296 |