EP4010481 - MICROFLUIDIC APPARATUS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nutcracker Therapeutics, Inc. 5858 Horton Street Suite 540 Emeryville CA 94608 / US | [2022/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELDRIDGE, Benjamin 5858 Horton Street, Suite 540 Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | 02 /
WEN, Ximiao 5858 Horton Street, Suite 540 Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/24] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20853111.1 | 10.08.2020 | [2022/24] | WO2020US45619 | Priority number, date | US201962885159P | 09.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962885159 P | US201962885170P | 09.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962885170 P | US201962914374P | 11.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962914374 P | [2022/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021030268 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4010481 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/34, C12Q1/68 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N15/101 (IL,US);
B01J19/0046 (CN,KR,US);
B01J19/0093 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B01L3/502707 (IL,KR);
B01L3/502769 (IL,KR,US);
C07H21/04 (KR);
C12M41/48 (IL,KR,US);
C12N15/10 (KR);
C12N15/1013 (EP,IL);
C12N15/1017 (EP,IL);
C12N15/11 (KR);
C12P19/34 (EP,IL,KR);
G01N21/01 (IL,KR,US);
B01J2219/00313 (CN,KR,US);
B01J2219/00333 (CN,KR,US);
B01J2219/00418 (CN,KR);
B01J2219/00493 (CN,KR);
B01J2219/00495 (CN,KR);
B01J2219/0054 (CN);
B01J2219/00547 (CN,KR);
B01J2219/00686 (CN,KR);
B01J2219/00722 (CN,KR,US);
B01J2219/00759 (CN,KR,US);
B01J2219/00858 (EP,IL,KR);
B01J2219/00905 (EP,IL,KR);
B01L2400/0487 (IL,KR,US);
G01N2021/0187 (IL,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] | Title | German: | MIKROFLUIDISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2022/24] | English: | MICROFLUIDIC APPARATUS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2022/24] | French: | APPAREIL MICROFLUIDIQUE ET SES PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2022/24] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 05.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010165784 (JOVANOVICH STEVAN B [US], et al); | [A]US2012164036 (STERN SETH [US], et al); | [Y]US2012245042 (LIU CHANGCHUN [US], et al); | [A]US2015276727 (TALEBPOUR SAMAD [CA], et al); | [A]US2018291413 (CHIOCCHINI CLAUDIA [DE], et al); | [A]US2019127731 (MCDERMOTT GEOFFREY [US]) | International search | [A]US2008281090 (LEE CHENG-CHUNG [US], et al); | [X]US2012164036 (STERN SETH [US], et al); | [A]US2012245042 (LIU CHANGCHUN [US], et al); |