EP4013893 - DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 02.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Talis Biomedical Corporation 230 Constitution Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDESHMAND, Sayeed 230 Constitution Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
CAULEY, Thomas, H., III 230 Constitution Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 03 /
DIXON, John 230 Constitution Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 04 /
GLADE, David 230 Constitution Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 05 /
MAAMAR, Hédia 230 Constitution Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 06 /
MCADAMS, Michael, John 230 Constitution Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 07 /
NG, Dzam-Si, Jesse 230 Constitution Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 08 /
ROLFE, David, Alexander 230 Constitution Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Cavanna, Edward Paul, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 20853279.6 | 17.08.2020 | [2022/25] | WO2020US46721 | Priority number, date | US201962887469P | 15.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962887469 P | US201916655028 | 16.10.2019 Original published format: US201916655028 | US201916655007 | 16.10.2019 Original published format: US201916655007 | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021030812 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4013893 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6844, C12Q1/6806, G01N33/53, G01N33/50, B01L3/00 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
B01L3/502715 (EP,IL);
A61B5/150961 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12Q1/6844 (IL,KR,US);
A61B5/150221 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61B5/150755 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B01L3/502761 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B01L7/52 (KR);
C12Q1/6888 (IL,KR,US);
C12Q1/689 (EP,IL,US);
C12Q1/70 (KR);
G01N35/00029 (EP,IL);
B01L2200/04 (EP,IL);
B01L2200/0605 (EP);
B01L2200/10 (EP,IL);
B01L2200/16 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B01L2300/021 (EP,IL);
B01L2300/047 (IL,KR,US);
B01L2300/0681 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B01L2300/0809 (IL,KR,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,IL);
B01L2300/0864 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/25] | C12Q1/6844, C12Q1/6806, G01N33/53, G01N33/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | DIAGNOSESYSTEM | [2022/25] | English: | DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEM | [2022/25] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DIAGNOSTIC | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 01.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018021783 (ARLETT BEN [GB], et al) [A] 1-20* paragraphs [0111] , [ 0134] , [ 0219] - [0232] * | International search | [X]US2009061450 (HUNTER WILLIAM SAMUEL [AU]) [X] 1,77-78 * ; abstract; figures 7, 15; paragraphs [0021], [0027], [0029], [0031]-[0035], [0043]-[0045], [0048], [0050], [0052], [0072], [0077], [0088], [0100], [0104]-[0106], [0109], [0115], [0119]-[0120], [0123] *; | [Y]US2013331298 (REA LARRY [US]) [Y] 8-9,21-22 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0046], [0058], [0077]-[0080], [0093]-[0094] *; | [Y]US8709787 (HANDIQUE KALYAN [US]) [Y] 91-92 * ; column 12, lines 1-16; claim 7 *; | [XY]GB2516667 (ATLAS GENETICS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,5-7, 18,20, 87-90 * ; abstract; figure 1; page 4, lines 23-28; page 7, lines 10-12; page 8, lines 21-25; page 10, lines 19-25; page 11, lines 11-14; page 14, lines 5-6; page 16, lines 12-14; page 20, lines 11-16; page 21, lines 1-3, lines 17-19; page 24, lines 18-20; page 31, lines 1-8, 17-37; page 32, lines 1-19; page 34, lines 15-19, 28-34; page 38, lines 29-36; page 43, lines 1-3 * [Y] 8-17, 19, 21-25, 76, 79-81. 91-92, 102-106; | [Y]US2016258880 (SMORGON SERGEY [SG], et al) [Y] 101* ; translation; abstract; paragraphs [0031],[0033] *; | [Y]US2016310948 (NOWAKOWSKI MARK [US], et al) [Y] 14-15, 79-81, 102-106 * ; abstract; figure 22; paragraphs [0060], [0089], [0116], [0129], [0165]-[0166], [0184] *; | [Y]US2017327867 (DOHALE ABHIJIT [US], et al) [Y] 10, 93-95, 99-101 * ; figures 18A-18B, 30; paragraphs [0043], [0055], [0177], [0185], [0187] *; | [Y]CN107429281 (ANDREYEV BORIS) [Y] 12-13 * ; see machine translation; paragraphs [0047], [0088], [0091], [0129], [0243], [0315] *; | [Y]US2018016624 (YUE MIN [US], et al) [Y] 93-101 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0114]-[0115], [0128], [0175] *; | [Y]US2018243739 (SCHENK ZU SCHWEINSBERG ALEXANDER [DE], et al) [Y] 11 * ; paragraph [0047] *; | [Y]US2019201898 (CUCCHI DAVIDE [IT], et al) [Y] 16-17, 19, 23-25, 76 * ; paragraphs [0020], [0091], [0096], [0098], [0220] * | by applicant | US9108192 | US9309879 | US2017157611 | US2018021783 | WO2018111728 | EP3406340 | US10173215 | US10183293 | US2019160443 | US10450616 | - L. R. SNYDERKIRKLAND, J. J., An Introduction to Modern Liquid Chromatography, Elsevier Scientific Publishing Co., (19790000), page 108 | WO2017US65444 | WO2019US18351 | WO2019US23764 |