EP3993493 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XUE, Yifan Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Jian Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20853359.6 | 27.07.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020CN104985 | Priority number, date | CN201910753227 | 15.08.2019 Original published format: CN201910753227 | [2022/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021027551 | Date: | 18.02.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3993493 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3993493 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W76/28, H04W52/02 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
H04L5/0078 (EP);
H04W72/23 (CN,US);
H04L5/0042 (US);
H04L5/0053 (CN);
H04L5/0098 (EP,US);
H04W52/0216 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/37] | H04L5/00, H04W76/28, H04W52/00 | ||
Former IPC [2022/18] | H04W28/20, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2022/18] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2022/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2022 | Translation filed | 28.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 02.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2023 | CZ | 08.11.2023 | DK | 08.11.2023 | EE | 08.11.2023 | ES | 08.11.2023 | HR | 08.11.2023 | LT | 08.11.2023 | LV | 08.11.2023 | NL | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | RO | 08.11.2023 | RS | 08.11.2023 | SE | 08.11.2023 | SK | 08.11.2023 | SM | 08.11.2023 | BG | 08.02.2024 | NO | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | PT | 08.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
CZ | 08.11.2023 | ||
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA] - MEDIATEK INC, "Summary of Cross-slot Scheduling Power-Saving Techniques", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, NV, USA; 20190513 - 20190517, (20190520), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1907918_SUMMARY#3 OF OFFLINE ON CROSS-SLOT SCHEDULING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; F, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F97/Docs/R1%2D1907918%2Ezip, (20190520), XP051740176 [X] 1,2,7-10,15 * page 20 * [A] 3-6,11-14 | [IA] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Procedure of cross-slot scheduling for UE power saving", vol. RAN WG1, (20190503), pages 1 - 12, 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1906006, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F97/Docs/R1%2D1906006%2Ezip, XP051708048 [I] 1,2,7-10,15 * page 5 - page 6 * [A] 3-6,11-14 |