EP4069196 - EYE TOPICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING METABOLITES OF THE FERMENTATION OF LACTOBACILLUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NO | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIFI S.p.A. Via Ercole Patti, 36 Frazione Lavinaio 95025 Aci Sant'Antonio (CT) / IT | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLFATO, Elena Corso San Vito 42 95030 Mascalucia / IT | 02 /
SUDANO ROCCARO, Andrea Via Vittorio Sardella 9 95024 Acireale / IT | 03 /
ZAPPULLA, Cristina Maria Concetta C.so delle province, 80 95127 Catania / IT | 04 /
SPOTO, Carmela Giovanna Via Giacomo Matteotti, 9A 95022 Acicatena / IT | 05 /
SPINA, Donato Via del Carabiniere, 11A 95030 Gravina di Catania / IT | 06 /
PEPE, Veronica Via Venezia, 15D 95030 Mascalucia / IT | 07 /
SANTONOCITO, Manuela Via Porto Marretti, 17 95030 Mascalucia / IT | 08 /
PRICOCO, Angelo Via S. Francesco, 8 95030 Mascalucia / IT | 09 /
VIOLA, Santa Via Cimetero, 82 95010 Sant'Alfio / IT | 10 /
CURATOLO, Maria Cristina Via Giovanni Paolo II, n.33 95029 Viagrande / IT | 11 /
MAZZONE, Maria Grazia Via Michele Messina, 10 95025 Aci Sant'Antonio / IT | 12 /
DE PASQUALE, Giuseppe Via Ettore Majorana, 6 95030 Pedara / IT | 13 /
GIULIANO, Francesco Via Etnea, 337 95030 Mascalucia / IT | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Cattaneo, Elisabetta, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [2024/05] |
Former [2022/41] | Coppo, Alessandro, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 20853537.7 | 04.12.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020IB61477 | Priority number, date | IT20190023142 | 05.12.2019 Original published format: IT201900023142 | [2022/41] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021111372 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4069196 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4069196 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/08, A61K35/00, A61K35/747, A61K47/02, A61K47/46 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
A61K9/0048 (EP,US);
A61K35/747 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (US);
A61K47/12 (US);
A61K47/46 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TOPISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR DAS AUGE MIT METABOLITEN DER FERMENTATION VON LACTOBACILLUS | [2022/41] | English: | EYE TOPICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING METABOLITES OF THE FERMENTATION OF LACTOBACILLUS | [2022/41] | French: | COMPOSITION OCULAIRE TOPIQUE CONTENANT DES MÉTABOLITES DE LA FERMENTATION DE LACTOBACILLUS | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 29.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NO | 30.04.2024 | IS | 31.05.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/32] | IS | 31.05.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2018024833 (ST EUROPEO DI ONCOLOGIA S R L [IT]) [A] 1-11* page 10, line 15 - page 11, line 6; claims 1,7 * |