EP4013283 - DEVICES FOR USE IN INTERVENTIONAL AND SURGICAL PROCEDURES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Body Vision Medical Ltd. 166 Ben Gurion 4720809 Ramat Hasharon / IL | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AVERBUCH, Dorian 166 Ben Gurion 4720809 Ramat Hasharon / IL | 02 /
AMIR, Eliron 166 Ben Gurion 4720809 Ramat Hasharon / IL | 03 /
HARARI, Boaz 166 Ben Gurion 4720809 Ramat Hasharon / IL | 04 /
SEZGANOV, Dima 166 Ben Gurion 4720809 Ramat Hasharon / IL | 05 /
NEEMAN, Ronen 166 Ben Gurion 4720809 Ramat Hasharon / IL | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 20854534.3 | 14.08.2020 | [2022/25] | WO2020IB00676 | Priority number, date | US201962888288P | 16.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962888288 P | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021033025 | Date: | 25.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4013283 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/01, A61M25/06, A61B90/00 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
A61M25/0136 (EP);
A61M25/0138 (US);
A61B90/37 (EP,US);
A61B90/39 (US);
A61M25/0147 (EP,US);
A61M25/0662 (EP);
A61B2090/365 (EP);
A61B2090/376 (EP);
A61B2090/3762 (EP);
A61B2090/3764 (EP);
A61B2090/3966 (EP);
A61B90/96 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/25] | A61B1/00, A61B17/00, A61M25/00, A61M25/01, A61M25/09, A61M31/00, A61M37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG IN INTERVENTIONELLEN UND CHIRURGISCHEN EINGRIFFEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2022/25] | English: | DEVICES FOR USE IN INTERVENTIONAL AND SURGICAL PROCEDURES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2022/25] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS DANS DES ACTES CHIRURGICAUX ET INTERVENTIONNELS ET LEURS MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 03.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/35] | 23.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012123327 (MILLER AARON J [US]) [X] 1-3,5-15 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 94; figures 1-10B *; | [A]US2014005647 (SHUFFLER SAMUEL H [US], et al) [A] 3* page 1, paragraph 5 - page 15, paragraph 196; figures 1-21 *; | [X]US2019030286 (MATHIS MARK [US], et al) [X] 1,4-15 * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 16, paragraph 147; figures 1A-21 * | International search | [A]US2016045710 (HOMSY CHRISTIAN [BE], et al) [A] 1-15* , entire document *; | [XY]US2017368304 (COLE GREGORY [US], et al) [X] 1, 4-6 * , entire document * [Y] 2-3, 7-15; | [A]US2019008557 (LENKER JAY A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * , entire document *; | [Y]US2019239724 (AVERBUCH DORIAN [IL], et al) [Y] 2-3, 7-15 * , entire document * |