EP4020159 - IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND CONTENT SHARING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | For all designated states Beijing BOE Technology Development Co., Ltd. Room 407, Building 1 No. 9 Dize Road, BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Junjie No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 20854572.3 | 20.08.2020 | [2022/26] | WO2020CN110240 | Priority number, date | CN201910775307 | 21.08.2019 Original published format: CN201910775307 | [2022/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021032160 | Date: | 25.02.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4020159 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
G06F3/1454 (EP);
G09G5/373 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G09G5/391 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F3/14 (KR);
G09G2340/04 (EP);
G09G2340/0442 (EP,US);
G09G2370/02 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE INHALTSTEILUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2022/26] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND CONTENT SHARING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2022/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, ET PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PARTAGE DE CONTENU | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2022 | Translation filed | 14.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 22.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005259144 (ESHKOLI NOAM [IL]); | [X]US2014043431 (KATO YOSHINAGA [JP]); | [X]WO2018182296 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [P]EP3588264 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |