EP3931853 - AUTOMATED APPLICATION OF DRIFT CORRECTION TO SAMPLE STUDIED UNDER ELECTRON MICROSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Protochips, Inc. 3800 Gateway Centre Boulevard Suite 306 Morrisville, North Carolina 27560 / US | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALDEN, II Franklin Stampley 409 Calvin Rd. Unit 2 Raleigh, NC 27605 / US | 02 /
DAMIANO, JR. John 231 Kenmont Dr. Holly Springs, NC 27540 / US | 03 /
NACKASHI, David P. 8701 Southampton Drive Raleigh, NC 27615 / US | 04 /
GARDINER, Daniel Stephen 508 Rayburn Avenue Wake Forest, NC 27587 / US | 05 /
UEBEL, Mark 201 Ridge Creek Dr. Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | 06 /
FRANKS, Alan Philip 4409 Sun Valley Drive Durham, NC 27707 / US | 07 /
JACOBS, Benjamin 1002 Elbury Dr. Apex, NC 27502 / US | [2024/06] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
WALDEN, II, Franklin, Stampley Raleigh, NC 27605 / US | ||
02 /
DAMIANO, JR., John Holly Springs, NC 27540 / US | |||
03 /
NACKASHI, David, P. Raleigh, NC 27615 / US | |||
04 /
GARDINER, Daniel, Stephen Wake Forest, NC 27587 / US | |||
05 /
UEBEL, Mark Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | |||
06 /
FRANKS, Alan, Philip Durham, NC 27707 / US | |||
07 /
JACOBS, Benjamin Apex, NC 27502 / US | Representative(s) | Serjeants LLP Dock 75 Exploration Drive Leicester, LE4 5NU / GB | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 20854644.0 | 12.08.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020US45937 | Priority number, date | US201962888309P | 16.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962888309 P | [2022/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021034569 | Date: | 25.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3931853 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3931853 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/22, H01J37/26, G01N23/2251, // H01J37/28 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
H01J37/222 (EP,CN);
H04N23/695 (US);
G06T7/215 (CN,US);
G06T7/337 (CN,US);
H01J37/265 (EP,CN);
H04N5/222 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/01] | H01J37/21, H01J37/22, H01J37/244, H01J37/28, G01N23/2251 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE ANWENDUNG DER DRIFTKORREKTUR AUF EINE UNTER DEM ELEKTRONENMIKROSKOP UNTERSUCHTE PROBE | [2022/01] | English: | AUTOMATED APPLICATION OF DRIFT CORRECTION TO SAMPLE STUDIED UNDER ELECTRON MICROSCOPE | [2022/01] | French: | APPLICATION AUTOMATISÉE DE CORRECTION DE DÉRIVE À UN ÉCHANTILLON ÉTUDIÉ SOUS MICROSCOPE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 21.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24182694.0 / EP4414698 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.10.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS63202834 (JEOL LTD); | [A]JP2001118535 (HITACHI LTD); | [XI]US2006076492 (TANIGUCHI YOSHIFUMI [JP], et al); | International search | [Y]US2003201393 (TSUNETA RURIKO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2012104253 (TSUNETA RURIKO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2018286630 (TAKEKOSHI HIDEKAZU [JP]); | [A]KR20180119699 (KLA TENCOR CORP [US]); | [AX]KR101964529B (KOREA BASIC SCIENCE INST [KR]) |