EP4018443 - SEQUENTIAL SLC READ OPTIMIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way Boise, ID 83716 / US | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWASAKI, Tomoko Ogura 5925 Hosta Lane San Jose, California 95124 / US | 02 /
EVANS, Tracy D. 825 East State Street Boise, Idaho 83712 / US | 03 /
TRIVEDI, Avani F. 3303 South Island Fox Avenue Boise, Idaho 83616 / US | 04 /
LIMAYE, Aparna U. 1472 East Spinnaker Court Boise, Idaho 83706 / US | 05 /
HUANG, Jianmin 116 Club Drive San Carlos, California 94070 / US | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/26] | Granleese, Rhian Jane, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 20854956.8 | 20.08.2020 | [2022/26] | WO2020US47263 | Priority number, date | US201962889240P | 20.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962889240 P | US202016947795 | 17.08.2020 Original published format: US202016947795 | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021035085 | Date: | 25.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4018443 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/16, G11C16/26, G11C11/56, G11C8/06, G11C8/08, G11C7/10, G06F3/06 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
G11C11/5642 (EP,KR);
G11C16/26 (EP,KR);
G11C11/4087 (US);
G06F12/0246 (KR,US);
G06F13/1631 (EP);
G11C11/4074 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/26] | G11C8/06, G11C8/08, G11C7/10, G06F3/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | SEQUENTIELLE SLC-LESEOPTIMIERUNG | [2022/26] | English: | SEQUENTIAL SLC READ OPTIMIZATION | [2022/26] | French: | OPTIMISATION SÉQUENTIELLE DE LECTURE DE SLC | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 22.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6559850 (STRONGIN GEOFFREY S [US], et al); | [A]US2012311247 (YEH CHIH-KANG [TW]); | [A]US2013262745 (LIN GARY [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2009073771 (LI YAN [US]) [A] 1-20; | [Y]US7688614 (MORIMOTO HIDENORI [JP]) [Y] 4-6,11-13,18-20; | [A]KR20100122720 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20; | [A]KR20140116617 (AJOU UNIV IND ACAD COOP FOUND [KR])[A] 1-20; | [YX]US9514057 (MARCU ALON [IL], et al) [Y] 4-6,11-13,18-20 [X] 1-3,7-10,14-17 | by applicant | US6559850 | US2012311247 | US2013262745 |