EP3936475 - CARBON NANOTUBE DISPERSION, AND NEGATIVE ELECTRODE SLURRY, NEGATIVE ELECTRODE, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/02] | CARBON NANOTUBE DISPERSION SOLUTION, NEGATIVE ELECTRODE SLURRY COMPRISING SAME, NEGATIVE ELECTRODE, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY | ||
[2023/39] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PT | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/13] |
Former [2022/02] | For all designated states LG ENERGY SOLUTION, LTD. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Dong Hyun LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
YOO, Houng Sik LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
MOON, Il Jae LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
CHOY, Sang Hoon LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
CHOI, Hyeon LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2024/06] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
KIM, Dong Hyun Daejeon 34122 / KR | ||
02 /
YOO, Houng Sik Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
03 /
MOON, Il Jae Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
04 /
CHOY, Sang Hoon Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
05 /
CHOI, Hyeon Daejeon 34122 / KR | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20855461.8 | 21.08.2020 | [2022/02] | WO2020KR11175 | Priority number, date | KR20190102591 | 21.08.2019 Original published format: KR 20190102591 | [2022/02] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021034145 | Date: | 25.02.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3936475 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3936475 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C01B32/174, H01M4/62, H01M4/131, H01M4/134, H01M10/052, H01M4/48, H01M4/38 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
C01B32/174 (EP,KR);
H01M4/625 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B82Y30/00 (CN);
H01M10/052 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (CN,US);
H01M4/131 (EP,KR);
H01M4/133 (CN);
H01M4/134 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/386 (CN,KR);
H01M4/483 (KR);
H01M4/587 (CN);
C01P2006/40 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOHLENSTOFFNANORÖHRCHEN-DISPERSION, NEGATIVE ELEKTRODENAUFSCHLÄMMUNG, NEGATIVE ELEKTRODE UND LITHIUM-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, DIE DIESE ENTHÄLT | [2023/39] | English: | CARBON NANOTUBE DISPERSION, AND NEGATIVE ELECTRODE SLURRY, NEGATIVE ELECTRODE, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY INCLUDING THE SAME | [2023/39] | French: | DISPERSION DE NANOTUBES DE CARBONE, BOUE D'ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE, ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM LA CONTENANT | [2023/39] |
Former [2022/02] | KOHLENSTOFFNANORÖHREN-DISPERSIONSLÖSUNG, NEGATIVE ELEKTRODENAUFSCHLÄMMUNG DAMIT, NEGATIVE ELEKTRODE UND LITHIUM-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | ||
Former [2022/02] | CARBON NANOTUBE DISPERSION SOLUTION, NEGATIVE ELECTRODE SLURRY COMPRISING SAME, NEGATIVE ELECTRODE, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY | ||
Former [2022/02] | SOLUTION DE DISPERSION DE NANOTUBES DE CARBONE, BOUILLIE D'ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE COMPRENANT CELLE-CI, ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2021 | Translation filed | 08.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 12.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23219268.2 / EP4329009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.02.2024 | BG | 07.02.2024 | FI | 07.02.2024 | HR | 07.02.2024 | LT | 07.02.2024 | LV | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | RS | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | PT | 07.06.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 07.02.2024 | |
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20190065172 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | International search | [A]JP2010195671 (KAWAKEN FINE CHEMICALS CO); | [A]KR20140009927 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20180054355 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20190065172 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); |