EP4016909 - METHOD FOR INDICATING ENERGY SAVING INFORMATION, BASE STATION AND USER TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Datang Mobile Communications Equipment Co., Ltd. 1/F, Building 1, No. 5 Shangdi East Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Meiying 1/F, Building 1, No. 5 Shangdi East Road, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Jiaqing 1/F, Building 1, No. 5 Shangdi East Road, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 03 /
ZHAO, Zheng 1/F, Building 1, No. 5 Shangdi East Road, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 04 /
LUO, Chen 1/F, Building 1, No. 5 Shangdi East Road, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/25] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 20855801.5 | 12.08.2020 | [2022/25] | WO2020CN108701 | Priority number, date | CN201910760919 | 16.08.2019 Original published format: CN201910760919 | [2022/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021031958 | Date: | 25.02.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4016909 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W72/12, H04W52/02 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
H04W52/0216 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP,KR);
H04W52/0229 (CN,KR);
H04W52/0235 (US);
G06F1/3209 (EP);
G06F1/3287 (EP);
H04L5/0035 (EP,KR);
H04L5/0094 (KR);
H04L5/0098 (KR,US);
H04W52/0258 (EP);
H04W52/0296 (EP);
H04W72/0446 (CN,US);
H04W72/1263 (US);
H04W72/23 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/324 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/25] | H04L5/00, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ANZEIGEN VON ENERGIESPARINFORMATION, BASISSTATION UND BENUTZERENDGERÄT | [2022/25] | English: | METHOD FOR INDICATING ENERGY SAVING INFORMATION, BASE STATION AND USER TERMINAL | [2022/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INDICATION D'INFORMATIONS D'ÉCONOMIE D'ÉNERGIE, STATION DE BASE ET TERMINAL UTILISATEUR | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2022 | Translation filed | 11.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 14.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - SONY, "On cross-slot scheduling for power saving", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20190513 - 20190517, (20190513), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1906857 - POWER SAVING CROSS_SLOT V3, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN1/Docs/R1%2D1906857%2Ezip, (20190513), XP051728308 [X] 1-6,8,11,13-15 * sections 2.1, 2.2, 3.2 * [I] 7,9,10,12 | [A] - APPLE INC, "Cross Slot Scheduling for UE Power Saving", vol. RAN WG1, no. Xi'an, China; 20190408 - 20190412, (20190403), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1904986 CROSS SLOT SCHEDULING FOR UE POWER SAVING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANC, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F96b/Docs/R1%2D1904986%2Ezip, (20190403), XP051707360 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; NR; Study on User Equipment (UE) power saving in NR (Release 16)", 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL REPORT; 3GPP TR 38.840, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20190624), no. V16.0.0, pages 1 - 74, XP051754330 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |