EP4024501 - INORGANIC SOLID ELECTROLYTE-CONTAINING COMPOSITION, SHEET FOR SOLID-STATE SECONDARY BATTERIES, SOLID-STATE SECONDARY BATTERY, AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING SOLID-STATE SECONDARY BATTERY AND SHEET FOR SOLID-STATE SECONDARY BATTERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 14.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISOJIMA, Hiroshi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation, 577, Ushijima, Kaisei- machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Hideyuki c/o FUJIFILM Corporation, 577, Ushijima, Kaisei- machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | 03 /
YASUDA, Koji c/o FUJIFILM Corporation, 577, Ushijima, Kaisei- machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20856030.0 | 28.08.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020JP32527 | Priority number, date | JP20190157944 | 30.08.2019 Original published format: JP 2019157944 | JP20190193350 | 24.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019193350 | JP20200088767 | 21.05.2020 Original published format: JP 2020088767 | [2022/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021039950 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024501 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/13, H01M4/139, H01M4/62, H01M10/052, H01M10/0562, H01M10/0585, H01B1/06, H01B1/08, H01B1/10, H01B1/22 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
H01M10/0562 (EP,KR,US);
H01B1/10 (KR);
H01M10/052 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (US);
H01M10/0585 (EP);
H01M4/13 (KR);
H01M4/139 (EP,KR);
H01M4/62 (KR);
H01M4/623 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | ANORGANISCHE FESTE ELEKTROLYTHALTIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, FOLIE FÜR FESTKÖRPERSEKUNDÄRBATTERIEN, FESTKÖRPERSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FESTKÖRPERSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND FOLIE FÜR FESTKÖRPERSEKUNDÄRBATTERIEN | [2022/27] | English: | INORGANIC SOLID ELECTROLYTE-CONTAINING COMPOSITION, SHEET FOR SOLID-STATE SECONDARY BATTERIES, SOLID-STATE SECONDARY BATTERY, AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING SOLID-STATE SECONDARY BATTERY AND SHEET FOR SOLID-STATE SECONDARY BATTERIES | [2022/27] | French: | COMPOSITION CONTENANT UN ÉLECTROLYTE SOLIDE INORGANIQUE, FEUILLE POUR BATTERIES SECONDAIRES À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, BATTERIE SECONDAIRE À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION DE BATTERIE SECONDAIRE À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET FEUILLE POUR BATTERIES SECONDAIRES À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2022 | Translation filed | 11.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 14.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2018151119 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-18* example -; claims 1,4-10 *; | [E]EP4002514 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [E] 1-6,9-18 * paragraph [0362]; example -; claims 1-3,15-22; compounds binder B15-B26,B28, B30,B32 * | International search | [A]JP2009277562 (NEC TOKIN CORP) [A] 1-18 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]WO2010029676 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2011065841 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-18 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2015076350 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-18 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]WO2018230336 (NOK CORP [JP]) [A] 1-18* entire text * | by applicant | JPS6222066 | JPH026856 | JPH0345473 | JPH0590844 | JPH064516 | JP2014078400 | JP2015088486 | WO2018020827 | JP2019157944 | JP2019193350 | JP2020088767 | - H. L. HOY, JOURNAL OF PAINT TECHNOLOGY, (19700000), vol. 42, no. 541, pages 76 - 118 | - T. OHTOMOA. HAYASHIM. TATSUMISAGOY. TSUCHIDAS. HAMAK. KAWAMOTO, Journal of Power Sources, (20130000), vol. 233, pages 231 - 235 | - A. HAYASHIS. HAMAH. MORIMOTOM. TATSUMISAGOT. MINAMI, Chem. Lett., (20010000), pages 872 - 873 |