EP3998517 - SELF-PROPELLED MOWING SYSTEM, AND METHOD OF PERFORMING SUPPLEMENTARY MOWING OPERATION ON MISSED REGIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanjing Chervon Industry Co., Ltd. No. 529, Jiangjun Road Jiangning Economic and Technical Development Zone Nanjing, Jiangsu 211106 / CN | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Weipeng No. 99, Tianyuan West Road, Jiangning Economic And Technical Development Zone Nanjing, Jiangsu 211106 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Dezhong No. 99, Tianyuan West Road, Jiangning Economic And Technical Development Zone Nanjing, Jiangsu 211106 / CN | 03 /
MEI, Qingxiao No. 99, Tianyuan West Road, Jiangning Economic And Technical Development Zone Nanjing, Jiangsu 211106 / CN | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Sun, Yiming HUASUN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstraße 33 80801 München / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20856753.7 | 27.08.2020 | [2022/20] | WO2020CN111632 | Priority number, date | CN201910793036 | 27.08.2019 Original published format: CN201910793036 | CN201910865102 | 12.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910865102 | CN201911411522 | 31.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911411522 | [2022/19] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021037116 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3998517 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, A01D34/00 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
G05D1/0219 (EP,US);
A01D34/008 (EP,US);
A01D34/78 (US);
A01D69/02 (US);
G01S19/47 (US);
G05D1/0246 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | SELBSTFAHRENDES MÄHSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINES ZUSÄTZLICHEN MÄHBETRIEBS IN AUSGELASSENEN BEREICHEN | [2022/19] | English: | SELF-PROPELLED MOWING SYSTEM, AND METHOD OF PERFORMING SUPPLEMENTARY MOWING OPERATION ON MISSED REGIONS | [2022/19] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TONTE AUTOPORTÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALISATION D'UNE OPÉRATION DE TONTE SUPPLÉMENTAIRE SUR DES RÉGIONS MANQUÉES | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2022 | Translation filed | 10.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 10.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2018004217 (BIBER PETER [DE], et al) [X] 1,6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0007] , [0010] , [0014] , [0022] , [0029] , [0036] , [0041] , [0045] , [0054] , [0072] , [0087] , [0089] * * figures 1-6 *[I] 2-5,7-15 |