EP4021090 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND RELATED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Shaofeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 20857099.4 | 28.06.2020 | [2022/26] | WO2020CN98518 | Priority number, date | CN201910818639 | 30.08.2019 Original published format: CN201910818639 | [2022/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021036461 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4021090 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
H04W52/0235 (EP);
H04W4/027 (EP,CN,US);
H04W52/0206 (EP,US);
H04W36/324 (EP,CN,US);
H04W4/08 (EP);
H04W4/42 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/26] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD AND RELATED DEVICE | [2022/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2022 | Translation filed | 21.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 05.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/42] | 31.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2019166538 (WONG SHIN HORNG [GB], et al) | International search | [A]CN102164401 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN103442362 (UNIV SOUTHEAST); | [X]CN103582091 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP); | [X]CN104519556 (CHINA TELECOM CO LTD ); | [A]US2016174241 (ANSARI NIRWAN [US], et al) |