EP3993124 - SOLID-STATE ELECTROLYTE MEMBRANE AND SOLID-STATE LITHIUM-METAL BATTERY INCLUDING SAME, BATTERY MODULE, BATTERY PACK, AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited 2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City Fujian PRC 352100 / CN | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FU, Jiawei No.2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Chengyong No.2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
HU, Bobing No.2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 04 /
LI, Qian No.2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 05 /
CHENG, Meng No.2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 06 /
GUO, Yongsheng No.2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/18] | Gerauer, Marc Philippé Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20857408.7 | 27.08.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020CN111910 | Priority number, date | CN201910802273 | 28.08.2019 Original published format: CN201910802273 | [2022/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021037173 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3993124 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0562 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
H01M10/4235 (EP);
H01M10/0562 (CN);
H01M10/056 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (CN,US);
H01M2220/20 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | FESTELEKTROLYTMEMBRAN UND FESTKÖRPERLITHIUMMETALLBATTERIE DAMIT, BATTERIEMODUL, BATTERIEPACK UND VORRICHTUNG | [2022/18] | English: | SOLID-STATE ELECTROLYTE MEMBRANE AND SOLID-STATE LITHIUM-METAL BATTERY INCLUDING SAME, BATTERY MODULE, BATTERY PACK, AND DEVICE | [2022/18] | French: | MEMBRANE ÉLECTROLYTIQUE À L'ÉTAT SOLIDE ET BATTERIE AU LITHIUM-MÉTAL À L'ÉTAT SOLIDE COMPRENANT CETTE DERNIÈRE, MODULE DE BATTERIE, BLOC-BATTERIE ET DISPOSITIF | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2022 | Translation filed | 27.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 16.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE112013002219T (TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI KK [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,9* figures 1 and 3; par. 23, 39-40, 45-47 *; | [XI]US2017012319 (ANANDAN VENKATARAMANI [US], et al) [X] 1,4,9 * par. 2, 4, 30-31, 39, 41 * [I] 2,10-13 |