EP4021028 - METHOD BY WHICH DEVICE TRANSMITS AND RECEIVES CPM IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR SUPPORTING SIDELINK, AND DEVICE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL 07336 / KR | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWAK, Minsung IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
YANG, Seungryul IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/26] | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20857857.5 | 24.08.2020 | [2022/26] | WO2020KR11250 | Priority number, date | KR20190103395 | 23.08.2019 Original published format: KR 20190103395 | [2022/26] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021040352 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4021028 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/46, H04W4/02, H04W4/38, H04W92/18, H04W84/00 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
H04W84/005 (EP);
H04W4/38 (EP,US);
G01S5/0072 (US);
H04W4/023 (EP);
H04W4/12 (US);
H04W4/40 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/26] | H04W4/46, H04W4/02, H04W4/38, H04W92/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG UND ZUM EMPFANG VON CPM IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON SIDELINK UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2022/26] | English: | METHOD BY WHICH DEVICE TRANSMITS AND RECEIVES CPM IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR SUPPORTING SIDELINK, AND DEVICE THEREFOR | [2022/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PAR LEQUEL UN DISPOSITIF TRANSMET ET RECOIT UN CPM DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL PERMETTANT DE PRENDRE EN CHARGE UNE LIAISON LATÉRALE, ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2022 | Translation filed | 04.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 25.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - "Intelligent Transport Systems (ITS); Vehicular Communications; Basic Set of Applications; Analysis of the Collective Perception Service (CPS)", vol. WG ITS WG1 Application Requirements and Services, no. V0.0.11, (20180822), pages 1 - 65, ETSI DRAFT SPECIFICATION; 103 562, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, URL: docbox.etsi.org/ITS/ITSWG1/70-Draft/WG183/ITS-00183v0011.docx, (20180822), XP014326134 [Y] 1-14 * page 12, section 3 Definitions, symbols and abbreviations - page 28, section 6.5 Perceived Object Container;; figures 3,10-11 * | [Y] - HIGUCHI TAKAMASA ET AL, "Value-Anticipating V2V Communications for Cooperative Perception", 2019 IEEE INTELLIGENT VEHICLES SYMPOSIUM (IV), IEEE, (20190609), doi:10.1109/IVS.2019.8814110, pages 1947 - 1952, XP033606172 [Y] 1-14 * page 1947, section I. INTRODUCTION - page 1951, section C. V2V Communication Model * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IVS.2019.8814110 | [A] - Coll-Perales Baldomero ET AL, "ART-05-2016 - GA Nr 723390 | TransAID | Transition Areas for Infrastructure-Assisted Driving TransAID | D5.3 | Protocols for reliable V2X message exchange Pag. 1 Protocols for reliable V2X message exchange Project Acronym TransAID Project Title Transition Areas for Infrastructure-Assisted Driving Wo", (20160531), pages 1 - 84, URL: https://usercontent.one/wp/www.transaid.eu/wp-content/uploads/2017/Deliverables/WP5/TransAID_D5.3_Protocols-for-reliable-V2X-message-exchange.pdf, (20230324), XP093034597 [A] 1-14 * page 16, section 2.2 Analysis of V2X messages - page 17, section 2.2.1.2 CPM;; figures 2, 3 * | International search | [A]WO2018128946 (PCMS HOLDINGS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0071]-[0081]; and figures 7-8. *; | [A]US2018365909 (CHENG HONG [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0072]-[0166]; and figures 4, 10 and 13. *; | [A]US2019051151 (MUECK MARKUS DOMINIK [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0018]-[0036]; and figure 1. *; | [A]US2019098088 (BALTAR LEONARDO GOMES [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0011]-[0058]; and figures 1 and 3. *; | [A]EP3462754 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0238]-[0240]; and figure 28. * |