EP4021432 - ESKETAMINE FOR THE TREATMENT OF PATIENTS WITH MAJOR DEPRESSIVE DISORDER, INCLUDING SUICIDALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1125 Trenton-Harbourton Road Titusville, NJ 08560 / US | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANUSO, Carla M. 1125 Trenton-Harbourton Road Titusville New Jersey 08560 / US | 02 /
FU, Dong-Jing 1125 Trenton-Harbourton Road Titusville New Jersey 08560 / US | 03 /
IONESCU, Dawn F. 1125 Trenton-Harbourton Road Titusville New Jersey 08560 / US | 04 /
LANE, Roseanne 1125 Trenton-Harbourton Road Titusville New Jersey 08560 / US | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20857872.4 | 28.08.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020IB58030 | Priority number, date | US201962892841P | 28.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962892841 P | US201962897593P | 09.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962897593 P | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021038500 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4021432 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/135, A61K45/06, A61P25/24, A61K9/00, A61K9/08 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
A61K31/135 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP);
A61K9/0043 (US);
A61K9/08 (EP,US);
A61P25/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | A61K31/135, A61K45/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Extension states | BA | 28.03.2022 | ME | 28.03.2022 | Title | German: | ESKETAMIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PATIENTEN MIT STARKER DEPRESSIVER STÖRUNG, EINSCHLIESSLICH SUIZIDALITÄT | [2022/27] | English: | ESKETAMINE FOR THE TREATMENT OF PATIENTS WITH MAJOR DEPRESSIVE DISORDER, INCLUDING SUICIDALITY | [2022/27] | French: | ESKÉTAMINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE PATIENTS PRÉSENTANT UN TROUBLE DÉPRESSIF MAJEUR, NOTAMMENT LA SUICIDALITÉ | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 09.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 03.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 03.05.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 03.05.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.05.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2016172672 (ICAHN SCHOOL MED MOUNT SINAI [US]) [X] 1,3,5 * pages 7,8 * * claims 1-6,11 * [Y] 1-10; | [XY] - AJUB ELIAS ET AL, "Efficacy of Esketamine in the Treatment of Depression With Psychotic Features: A Case Series", BIOLOGICAL PSYCHIATRY, (20180101), vol. 83, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.BIOPSYCH.2017.06.011, ISSN 0006-3223, XP085287211 [X] 1,3-5 * page e15 * * table 1 * [Y] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biopsych.2017.06.011 | [XY] - BJERRE J ET AL, "Ketamine in melancholic depression", UGESKRIFT FOR LAEGER, DK, (20100208), vol. 172, no. 6, doi:https://pubmed.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/20146912/, ISSN 0041-5782, pages 460 - 461, XP093061580 [X] 1,3,5,7 * abstract * * Enclosed automatic translation * [Y] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/https://pubmed.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/20146912/ | [Y] - CARLA M CANUSO ET AL, "Efficacy and Safety of Intranasal Esketamine for the Rapid Reduction of Symptoms of Depression and Suicidality in Patients at Imminent Risk for Suicide: Results of a Double-Blind, Randomized, Placebo-Controlled Study", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PSYCHIATRY., US, (20180411), vol. 175, no. 7, doi:10.1176/appi.ajp.2018.17060720, ISSN 0002-953X, pages 620 - 630, XP055575012 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * tables 1-2 * * figures 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1176/appi.ajp.2018.17060720 | [Y] - REBECCA B PRICE ET AL, "EFFECTS OF KETAMINE ON EXPLICIT AND IMPLICIT SUICIDAL COGNITION: A RANDOMIZED CONTROLLED TRIAL IN TREATMENT-RESISTANT DEPRESSION", DEPRESSION AND ANXIETY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20140325), vol. 31, no. 4, doi:10.1002/DA.22253, ISSN 1091-4269, pages 335 - 343, XP072006337 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * figure 2 * * page 341, column left * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/da.22253 | International search | [A]US2013236573 (SINGH JASKARAN [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 11-14 * entire document *; | [A]US2016074340 (CAERS LODEWIJK IVO [BE], et al) [A] 1-4, 11-14 * entire document *; | [X]US2016338977 (SINGH JASKARAN [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 11-14 * abstract, para [0026], (0030], [0110] *; | [A]WO2019126108 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [A] 1-4, 11-14* entire document * |