EP4024859 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CODING VIDEO ON BASIS OF FILTERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL 07336 / KR | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Jangwon LG Electronics Inc. IP Center 19, Yangjae-daero, 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
NAM, Junghak LG Electronics Inc. IP Center 19, Yangjae-daero, 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [2024/40] |
Former [2022/27] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20859150.3 | 31.08.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020KR11591 | Priority number, date | US201962893754P | 29.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962893754 P | [2022/27] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021040479 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024859 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4024859 | Date: | 02.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/117, H04N19/82, H04N19/132, H04N19/186, H04N19/70 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/117 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/132 (CN,KR,US);
H04N19/18 (US);
H04N19/186 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/46 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VIDEOCODIERUNG MITTELS FILTERUNG | [2022/27] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CODING VIDEO ON BASIS OF FILTERING | [2022/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR CODER UNE VIDÉO SUR LA BASE D'UN FILTRAGE | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2022 | Translation filed | 03.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 06.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013101018 (CHONG IN SUK [US], et al); | [E]EP4024858 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [E]EP4024857 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | International search | [Y]KR20170044631 (ELECTRONICS & TELECOMMUNICATIONS RES INST [KR], et al); | [A]KR20190042579 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [A]KR20190097036 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); |