EP4019474 - METHOD FOR REPAIRING STEM CELLS AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wu, Siyuan No. 20, College Road Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Xinwei No. 20, College Road, Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | 02 /
WU, Linze No. 20, College Road, Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | 03 /
WU, Siyuan No. 20, College Road, Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | KIPA AB Drottninggatan 11 252 21 Helsingborg / SE | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 20859206.3 | 23.08.2020 | [2022/26] | WO2020CN110682 | Priority number, date | CN201910786774 | 23.08.2019 Original published format: CN201910786774 | [2022/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021036964 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4019474 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/30, C12N5/071, C12N5/073, C12N5/0735, C12N5/0775, C12N5/0797, C02F103/04, C02F1/48 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
C12N5/0668 (EP);
C02F1/30 (CN,US);
C02F1/005 (EP);
C02F1/34 (EP);
C02F1/487 (EP);
C12N5/0602 (CN);
C12N5/0605 (CN);
C12N5/0606 (CN);
C12N5/0623 (CN);
C12N5/0665 (CN,US);
C02F2103/026 (EP);
C02F2103/04 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/26] | C02F1/30, C12N5/071, C12N5/073, C12N5/0735, C12N5/0775, C12N5/0797, C02F103/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REPARATUR VON STAMMZELLEN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2022/26] | English: | METHOD FOR REPAIRING STEM CELLS AND USE THEREOF | [2022/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉPARATION DE CELLULES SOUCHES ET UTILISATION ASSOCIÉE | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2022 | Translation filed | 21.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 27.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [T] - KONTOGEORGIS GEORGIOS M. ET AL, "Water structure, properties and some applications - A review", CHEMICAL THERMODYNAMICS AND THERMAL ANALYSIS, (20220601), vol. 6, doi:10.1016/j.ctta.2022.100053, ISSN 2667-3126, page 100053, XP093070291 [T] 1-14 * page 15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ctta.2022.100053 | [XP] - WU SIYUAN ET AL, "Study of "Water of Life" on Repair of Human Umbilical Cord Mesenchymal Stem Cells", 2019 10TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY IN MEDICINE AND EDUCATION (ITME), IEEE, (20190823), doi:10.1109/ITME.2019.00052, pages 199 - 204, XP033694197 [XP] 1-14 * the whole document * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ITME.2019.00052 |